GunBroker.com, LLC v. Tenor Capital Partners, LLC
Plaintiff: GunBroker.com, LLC
Defendant: Tenor Capital Partners, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00613
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition re #102 MOTION to Take Deposition from Comstock Valuation Advisors, Inc. Defendant Tenor Capital Partners' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff Gunbroker.com, LLC's Motion For Leave to Take the Deposition of Comstock Valuation Advisors, Inc. filed by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - About Comstock)(Parrish, Matthew)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Upon consideration of the Motion and for good cause shown, it is hereby ordered that docket entries #102 , #103 and #104 are to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/7/2021. (ah)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #103 Reply Brief, #104 Notice of Filing, #102 MOTION to Take Deposition from Comstock Valuation Advisors, Inc. by GunBroker.com, LLC, GunBroker.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goselin, John)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE Of Filing by GunBroker.com, LLC re #102 MOTION to Take Deposition from Comstock Valuation Advisors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goselin, John)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Submission of #75 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment , to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ah)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing by GunBroker.com, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Declaration of John Goselin with Exhibit)(Goselin, John) Modified to edit text on 5/7/2021 (ah).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GunBroker.com, LLC, GunBroker.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts Response to Tenor's Statement of Additional Facts)(Goselin, John) Modified on 5/7/2021 (ah).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ---SEALED--- MOTION to Take Deposition from Comstock Valuation Advisors, Inc. with Brief In Support by GunBroker.com, LLC, GunBroker.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Goselin, John) Modified to edit text on 5/7/2021 (ah).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RESPONSE in Support re #75 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Parrish, Matthew)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #99 Motion for Extension of Time. Any reply memorandum in support of the pending motions for partial summary judgment #75 & #87 must be filed no later than May 5, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/26/2021. (ah)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time re: #93 Response to Motion, #96 Response in Opposition to Motion, #75 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GunBroker.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goselin, John)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #97 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. It is hereby ordered that Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Tenor Capital Partners, LLCs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Related Filings #96 are to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/16/2021. (ah)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #96 Response in Opposition to Motion, Response to Tenor Capital's Statement of Undisputed Facts by GunBroker.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goselin, John)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #75 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by GunBroker.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts Response to Tenor's Statement of Material Facts)(Goselin, John) Modified on 4/16/2021 (ah). Modified on 4/19/2021 (ah).
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of Richard Lance Robbins in Support of Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC re #93 Response to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard Lance Robbins With Accompanying Exhibit A)(Parrish, Matthew)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE Of Filing Tenor Second Appendix in Support of Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC re #93 Response to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schnabl Dep. Ex. 88)(Parrish, Matthew)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 RESPONSE re #87 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts Defendant's Statement of Additional Material Facts, #2 Statement of Material Facts Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Parrish, Matthew) Modified on 4/22/2021 (ah).
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #91 Motion for Extension of Time. Any responses in opposition to the pending motions for partial summary judgment #75 & #87 must be filed no later than April 14, 2021. The Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due within thirty (30) days of the Courts ruling on the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/6/2021. (ah)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Responses to Motions for Partial Summary Judgment by GunBroker.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goselin, John)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Submission of #84 MOTION for Oral Argument re #75 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ah)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #88 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. It is hereby ordered that Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Related Filings #87 are to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/17/2021. (ah)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #85 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT from the date of the entry of this Order until the termination of this litigation, the #77 and the #76 Appendix shall be filed under seal with access to the aforementioned documents limited to the parties, their counsel, and the Court. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/17/2021. (ah)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION to Seal Case Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal, MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GunBroker.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goselin, John)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ---SEALED--- MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by GunBroker.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Deposition of James T. Butler (Vol. 1), #4 Deposition of James T. Butler (Vol. 2), #5 Butler Depo Exhibits, #6 Deposition of Samuel Schnabl, #7 Schnabl Deposition Exhibits, #8 Deposition of Ty Dealy, #9 Ty Dealy Deposition Exhibits, #10 Amended Complaint, #11 Defendant's Responses to Plf's Request for Admissions, #12 Goselin Declaration - Exhibit A, #13 Goselin Declaration - Exhibit B, #14 Deposition of Steven Urvan, #15 Depo Exhibits of Steven Urvan)(Goselin, John) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- Modified on 3/17/2021 (ah).
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE Of Filing by GunBroker.com, LLC Notice of Filing The Declaration of John H. Goselin, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John H. Goselin, II)(Goselin, John)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #77 Deposition, #76 Notice of Filing Specifically, Deposition of Steven Urvan and Appendix with Brief In Support by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Parrish, Matthew)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION for Oral Argument re #75 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Parrish, Matthew)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC re #76 Notice of Filing Deposition of Ty Dealy (October 20, 2020) (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript of Ty Dealy)(Parrish, Matthew)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC re #76 Notice of Filing Deposition of Andre Schnabl (February 4, 2021) (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript of Andre Schnabl)(Parrish, Matthew)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC re #76 Notice of Filing Deposition of Andre Schnabl (February 3, 2021) (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript of Andre Schnabl)(Parrish, Matthew)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC re #76 Notice of Filing Deposition of Todd Butler (February 3, 2021) (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript of Todd Butler)(Parrish, Matthew)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC re #76 Notice of Filing Deposition of Todd Butler (February 2, 2021) (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript of Todd Butler)(Parrish, Matthew)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE Of Filing Declarations of Todd Butler & Andre Schnabl by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC re #75 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Butler, #2 Declaration of Andre Schnabl)(Parrish, Matthew)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SEALED DEPOSITION of Steven Urvan taken on November 11, 2020 by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript)(Parrish, Matthew) Modified on 3/17/2021 (ah).
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Appendix by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-37)(Parrish, Matthew) Modified on 3/17/2021 (ah).
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts)(Parrish, Matthew) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (mmc) (ADI)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Extension of Time. Modified scheduling order within. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/8/2021. (ah)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time re: #66 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, to File Motions Summary Judgment and to Exceed Page Limits by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC, Tenor Capital Partners, LLC, Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Newman, Michael)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Change of Address by GunBroker.com filed by counsel #70 using incorrect entry. (bdb)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE by GunBroker.com, LLC Notice of Change of Mailing Address (Lutz, Jeffrey)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE by GunBroker.com, LLC Notice of Leave of Absence (Lutz, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (mmc) (ADI)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Amended Deposition Notices by GunBroker.com, LLC.(Goselin, John)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING #65 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The period for completing discovery is extended to and through February 4, 2021 for the limited purpose of conducting depositions. Any Motions for Summary Judgment must be filed by March 8, 2021, and if no Motion for Summary Judgment is filed, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due on March 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/19/2021. (kt)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by GunBroker.com, LLC. (Goselin, John)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC Defendant's Withdrawal of Subpoena and Notice of Cancellation of MGG Investment Group LP's Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition (Parrish, Matthew)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Amended Notice of Deposition by GunBroker.com, LLC.(Goselin, John)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE by GunBroker.com, LLC Service of Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Subpoena)(Goselin, John)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Subpoena by GunBroker.com, LLC.(Goselin, John)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition by GunBroker.com, LLC.(Goselin, John)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Newman, Michael)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC.(Newman, Michael)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Newman, Michael)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC.(Newman, Michael)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE (by docket entry only): Please be advised that Charlotte Diggs, Courtroom Deputy to Chief Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr., has had to take leave and may be absent from the courthouse for several weeks. Effective immediately all communications related to cases assigned to Judge Thrash should be directed to Mr. Sam Johnston, who will be serving as interim Courtroom Deputy for Judge Thrash pending the return of Ms. Diggs. Mr. Johnston's telephone number is 706-378-4084, and his email is Sam_Johnston@gand.uscourts.gov. (tcc)
November 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Jeffrey Paul Lutz replacing attorney Ashley F. Cummings. (Lutz, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SCHEDULING ORDER re: #51 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The period for completing discovery is extended to and through December 16, 2020. Any Motions for Summary Judgment must be filed by January 16, 2020, and if no Motion for Summary Judgment is filed, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due on January 16, 2020. If, however, a Motion for Summary Judgment is filed, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due within thirty (30) days of the Court's ruling on any Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/30/2020. (kt)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC.(Newman, Michael)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by GunBroker.com, LLC. (Goselin, John)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery to Tenor Capital by GunBroker.com, LLC.(Goselin, John)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Notice of Deposition by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC.(Newman, Michael)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Parrish, Matthew)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Newman, Michael)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE and Notice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45 by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC.(Newman, Michael)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 - Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC.(Parrish, Matthew)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC.(Newman, Michael)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT from the date of the entry of this Order until the termination of this litigation, Exhibit E to the Declaration of M. Koty Newman shall be filed under seal with access to the Exhibit limited to the parties, their counsel, and the Court. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/1/2020. (kt)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #33 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Gunbroker.Com, LLC filed by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/1/2020. (kt)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT of a video/teleconference motion hearing held on 9/28/2020, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diane Peede, Diane_Peede@GAND.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/22/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (dcp)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (aaq) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 9/28/2020 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: re #33 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Gunbroker.Com, LLC filed by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #33 Motion to Compel. (Court Reporter Diane Peede)(kt)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Submission of #33 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Gunbroker.Com, LLC to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (kt)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re: #33 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Gunbroker.Com, LLC . Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Connection Instructions: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1612361390; Meeting ID: 161-236-1390; Passcode: 255194; Dial-in Number (if video unavailable): 646-828-7666. You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (cmd)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing re: 9/9/2020 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re: #33 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Gunbroker.Com, LLC . Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Hearing to be rescheduled. (cmd)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Submission of #35 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit "E" to M. Koty Newman Declaration/Affidavit filed in Support of Defendant Tenor Capital Partners, LLC's Motion to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Gunbroker.Com, LLC MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #34 Notice of Filing to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (kt)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY BRIEF re #33 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Gunbroker.Com, LLC filed by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Parrish, Matthew)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re: #33 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Gunbroker.Com, LLC . Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Connection Instructions: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1607625062; Meeting ID: 160-762-5062; Passcode: 137827; Dial-in Number (if video unavailable): 646-828-7666.You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (cmd)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (adg) (ADI)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Gunbroker.Com, LLC filed by GunBroker.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Goselin, John)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit "E" to M. Koty Newman Declaration/Affidavit filed in Support of Defendant Tenor Capital Partners, LLC's Motion to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Gunbroker.Com, LLC, MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #34 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC, Tenor Capital Partners, LLC, Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Parrish, Matthew)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing To Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Gunbroker.Com, LLC by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC re #33 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Gunbroker.Com, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Financing Agreement dated May 31, 2019)(Parrish, Matthew) Modified on 10/1/2020 (kt).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff Gunbroker.Com, LLC with Brief In Support by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC, Tenor Capital Partners, LLC, Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit of M. Kody Newman)(Parrish, Matthew)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (aaq) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/2/20. (jpa)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Tyson Parrish on behalf of Tenor Capital Partners, LLC (Parrish, Matthew)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (aaq) (ADI)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena , as to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC c/o Registered Agent CT Corporation. (Newman, Michael)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena , as to Aegis Fiduciary Services, LLC c/o Registered Agent Howard Smolin. (Newman, Michael)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena , as to MGG Investment Group LP c/o Registered Agent CT Corporation System. (Newman, Michael)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena , as to Ty Dealy. (Newman, Michael)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AGREED MUTUAL PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/24/2020. (tcc)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 and Notice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45 by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC.(Newman, Michael)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by GunBroker.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goselin, John)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4(A) Certification of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant's First Interrogatories and Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant's Requests for Production of Documents by GunBroker.com, LLC.(Goselin, John)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against GunBroker.com, LLC with Jury Demand by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC.(Newman, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery deadline in this case is November 16, 2020. Any amendments to the pleadings must be filed by April 15, 2020. Any Motions for Summary Judgment must be filed by December 16, 2020, and if no Motions for Summary Judgment are filed, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due on December 16, 2020. The Clerk is directed to submit this action on December 17, 2020 if the parties have not filed a Motion for Summary Judgment or Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/25/20. (kt)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (kt)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Initial Disclosures by GunBroker.com, LLC.(Goselin, John)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Amend Complaint with Brief In Support by GunBroker.com, LLC. (Goselin, John)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tenor Capital Partners, LLC filed by GunBroker.com, LLC.(Goselin, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Defendant's First Continuing Interrogatories to Plaintiff; Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff; and Tenor Capital Partners, LLC's Initial Disclosures by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC.(Newman, Michael)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by GunBroker.com, LLC. (Goselin, John)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Koty Newman on behalf of Tenor Capital Partners, LLC (Newman, Michael)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Counterclaim by GunBroker.com, LLC.(Goselin, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. Tenor Capital Partners, LLC served on 2/14/2020. (Robbins, Richard)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk's Notation re #2 & #5 Certificates of Interested Persons: OK, per TWT. (cmd)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Robbins, Richard) Modified to edit text on 2/19/2020 (ah).
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 11/10/2020.), COUNTERCLAIM against GunBroker.com, LLC with Jury Demand by Tenor Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoice, #2 Exhibit B - Tenor Demand 12-6-19, #3 Exhibit C - Tenor Response 12-27-19)(Robbins, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-00613-TWT. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 2/11/2020. (tcc)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by GunBroker.com, LLC. (Goselin, John)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by GunBroker.com, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9356283) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GunBroker.com, LLC v. Tenor Capital Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenor Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy U. Littlefield
Represented By: Michael Koty Newman
Represented By: Richard Lance Robbins
Represented By: Matthew Tyson Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GunBroker.com, LLC
Represented By: Ashley F. Cummings
Represented By: John H. Goselin, II
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?