First Communities v. Richardson
Plaintiff: First Communities
Defendant: Samantha Richardson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00744
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (kt)
April 15, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Samantha Richardson re #9 Remand Letter. (kt)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 Remand Letter To Clerk Magistrate Court of Fulton County. (kt)
April 15, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Samantha Richardson re #8 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (kt)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING [ ] Final Report and Recommendation. This case is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/15/20. (kt)
April 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alain Didier and Samantha Richardson re #7 Notice. (ddm)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
March 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alain Didier and Samantha Richardson re #6 Order. (ddm)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (ddm)
March 11, 2020 Submission of FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jed)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 OBJECTIONS to Report and Recommendation filed by Samantha Richardson. (tcc)
February 21, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alain Didier and Samantha Richardson re #2 Final Report and Recommendation, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (ddm)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #2 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/21/2020. (ddm)
February 21, 2020 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (contained within #2 ) recommending this case be remanded to the Fulton County Magistrate Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/21/2020. (ddm)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with COMPLAINT, filed by Samantha Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Defendant's Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/21/2020. (ddm)
February 20, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Samantha Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Communities v. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Communities
Represented By: Alain Didier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?