Tombow Pencil Co., Ltd. et al v. Impex Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: American Tombow, Inc. and Tombow Pencil Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Leib Lefkowitz, John Does 1-100, Impex Group LLC, Aron Grossman and Impex Trade Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00773
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 11 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jed)
March 30, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (jed)
March 30, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (jed)
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by American Tombow, Inc., Tombow Pencil Co., Ltd. (Thomas, Robert)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jed)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jed)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED AO 120 for Tombow Pencil Company. (Thomas, Robert)
February 21, 2020 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (kt)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Aron Grossman. (kt)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Leib Lefkowitz. (kt)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Impex Trade Group, Inc. (kt)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Impex Group LLC. (kt)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Tombow, Inc., Tombow Pencil Co., Ltd. (kt)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tombow Pencil Co., Ltd., American Tombow, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9391738). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tombow Pencil Co., Ltd. et al v. Impex Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leib Lefkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impex Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aron Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impex Trade Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Tombow, Inc.
Represented By: Robert DeWitt Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tombow Pencil Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Robert DeWitt Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?