Progress Residential v. Brown
Plaintiff: Progress Residential
Defendant: Angela Brown
Case Number: 1:2020cv00813
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Angela Brown re #19 Order on Application to Appeal in forma pauperis. (kt)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING #15 Application to Appeal in forma pauperis. Further requests to proceed in forma pauperis should be directed by motion to the circuit court within 30 days pursuant to Fed.R.App.P.24. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/13/20. (kt)
April 8, 2020 Filing 18 USCA Acknowledgment of #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela Brown. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 20-11284-A. (kac)
April 1, 2020 Filing 17 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Orders, Report and Recommendation, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #14 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
April 1, 2020 Filing 16 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re: #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela Brown. (kac)
April 1, 2020 Submission of #15 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (kac)
April 1, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis by Angela Brown. (kac)
April 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, Order on Application to Appeal in forma pauperis by Angela Brown. (kac)
March 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Clerk Magistrate Court of Henry County re: #13 Remand Letter #12 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, Docket Sheet, and Clerks Certificate of Mailing. (kt)
March 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Angela Brown re #12 Order on Final Report and Recommendation,, Order on Application to Appeal in forma pauperis, #13 Letter. (kt)
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 Remand Letter to Magistrate Court of Henry County. (kt)
March 26, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (kt)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING #3 Final Report and Recommendation. GRANTING #7 Application to Appeal in forma pauperis solely for the purpose of remand. This action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Henry County. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/26/20. (kt)
March 25, 2020 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Angela Brown, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (kt)
March 24, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Angela Brown re #11 Order. (kt)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (kt)
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 USCA Acknowledgment of #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela Brown. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 20-10947-A. (kac)
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order, Report and Recommendation, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #5 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re: #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela Brown. (kac)
March 6, 2020 Submission of #7 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. (kac)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis by Angela Brown. (kac)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 OBJECTIONS to #3 Report and Recommendation filed by Angela Brown. (kt)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation by Angela Brown. (kac)
February 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Angela Brown re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (anc)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/27/2020. (anc)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the #2 Notice of Removal beREMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Henry County, Georgia for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/27/2020. (anc)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Angela Brown. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(anc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/27/2020. (anc)
February 26, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (tmf)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angela Brown. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Notie of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progress Residential v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progress Residential
Represented By: Elizabeth Cruikshank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?