Glass v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Plaintiff: Libby P. Glass
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv00845
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Submission of #13 MOTION to Dismiss to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (jap)
April 13, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Hobart Schneider on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association (Schneider, Jeffrey)
April 13, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's #22 First Amended and Restated Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint and Jury Demand (Schneider, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/14/2020 to add document link and edit text (jap).
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
April 1, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness filed by Libby P. Glass. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Alembik, Richard)
April 1, 2020 Filing 22 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Associationwith Jury Demand filed by Libby P. Glass.(Alembik, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: Plaintiff's #6 Application for an Interlocutory (i.e., preliminary) Injunction is GRANTED, and that every named defendant in this action, and any defendant that may be joined or substituted into this action in the future, be and hereby are ENJOINED and RESTRAINED as directed herein. (See order for specifics.) Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/30/2020. (jap)
March 27, 2020 Filing 20 PROPOSED CONSENT Preliminary Injunction re: #12 Order on Motion for TRO. (Alembik, Richard) Modified on 3/30/2020 to edit text (jap).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jap)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting the #14 Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines Pending Ruling on #13 Motion to Dismiss. (See order for specifics.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 03/23/20. (aaq)
March 18, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Support re #14 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines filed by Libby P. Glass. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Consent Order Staying Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss)(Alembik, Richard)
March 18, 2020 Clerks Notation re #15 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
March 18, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER Order Granting Motion to Stay re: #14 MOTION to Stay . (Krivo, Gregory)
March 18, 2020 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Krivo, Gregory)
March 18, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Krivo, Gregory)
March 18, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint with Brief In Support by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Krivo, Gregory) Modified on 4/14/2020 to add document link and edit text (jap).
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry (by docket entry only). Based on recent determinations made by this Court (to be reflected shortly in a General Order from Chief Judge Thrash), Judge Ross intends to cancel every hearing she currently has scheduled between March 16, 2020 and April 14, 2020, and reschedule to the week of April 20, 2020. If there are any cases on which a hearing needs to proceed before April 20, please contact michelle_beck@gand.uscourts.gov or 404.215.1524. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/13/20. (mlb)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion for TRO. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this Order shall expire on the thirtieth (30) day after its entry, unless sooner dissolved by this Court. The Court SCHEDULES a hearing on Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Interlocutory Injunction for Wednesday, April 1, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1708. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 2/28/2020. (rjs)
February 28, 2020 NOTICE CANCELLING HEARING (by docket entry only). The Motion Hearing #7 scheduled for Monday, March 2, 2020 at 9:00 AM is CANCELLED. (mlb)
February 28, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER [Proposed] Consent Temporary Restraining Order and Notice of Hearing on Plaintiffs Application For an Interlocutory Injunction. (Alembik, Richard)
February 28, 2020 Submission of #8 Notice (Other), #7 Order,to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpa)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Libby P. Glass. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" --- Process Server's Affidavit)(Alembik, Richard)
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as per the Court's #7 Order of Feb. 26, 2020 filed by Libby P. Glass (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" -- Email to Laura G. Koushel, Esq. with attachments)(Alembik, Richard) Modified on 2/28/2020 to edit text (jap).
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE Regarding the Citizenship of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #7 Order by Libby P. Glass (Alembik, Richard) Modified on 2/28/2020 to edit text (jap).
February 26, 2020 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Libby P. Glass. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SCHEDULING a hearing for 3/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1708 before Judge Eleanor L. Ross on the #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Defendant must file on the docket a response to Plaintiff's motion by 3/1/20 at 5:00 p.m. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a notice indicating the citizenship of Defendant by 2/27/20. Failure to comply with the Court's order will result in the cancellation of the scheduled hearing. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 2/26/20. (jpa)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED with Brief In Support by Libby P. Glass. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" --- CERTIFICATE OF ATTORNEY FOR APPLICANT, #2 Brief OF AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF LIBBY P. GLASS FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND FOR AN INTERLOCUTORY INJUNCTION, #3 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING)(Alembik, Richard)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's request for a Temporary Restraining order and/or Preliminary Injunction as found in her #1 Complaint and REFERS this CASE to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand pursuant to Standing Order 18-01. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 2/25/20. (jpa)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Libby P. Glass. (Alembik, Richard)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
February 24, 2020 Submission of #1 Complaint regarding injunctive relief, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpa)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (jpa)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Libby P. Glass. Request for Preliminary Injunction included. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9406304) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glass v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Jeffrey Hobart Schneider
Represented By: Gregory Scott Krivo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Libby P. Glass
Represented By: Richard S. Alembik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?