Joseph v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ken Joseph
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee and Shapiro Pendergast & Hasty LLP
Case Number: 1:2020cv00851
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Submission of #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (jpa)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address for Ken Joseph (tmf)
April 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ken Joseph re #8 Notice (Other). (jpa)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
April 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ken Joseph re #7 Order. (rjs)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC Answer due 3/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 4/1/2020. (rjs)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - R&R in Joseph I, #2 Exhibit B - Final Order in Joseph I, #3 Exhibit C - Final Order in Joseph II)(Mendel, Jarrod)
March 24, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ken Joseph re #5 Order. (ah)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mendel, Jarrod)
March 18, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ken Joseph re #3 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (ah)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, shall have through and including March 23, 2020, in which to file its answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 3/18/2020. (ah)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (ah)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mendel, Jarrod)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9407977) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Jarrod Sean Mendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee
Represented By: Jarrod Sean Mendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro Pendergast & Hasty LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?