Zeal Global Services Private Limited v. Suntrust Bank et al
Plaintiff: Zeal Global Services Private Limited
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.) and Suntrust Bank
Case Number: 1:2020cv00908
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Zeal Global Services Private Limited. (Mikkelsen, Matthew) Modified on 4/21/2020 to edit text(bnp).
April 20, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Zeal Global Services Private Limited. (Mikkelsen, Matthew) Modified on 4/21/2020 to edit text (bnp).
April 9, 2020 Filing 32 Withdrawal of Motion #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Suntrust Bank filed by Suntrust Bank. (Windham, Mark)
April 7, 2020 Filing 31 Withdrawal of Motion #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.). (Stone, Kevin)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: By no later than Friday, April 10, 2020, Defendants are each directed to either: (1) withdraw their original #5 #9 Motions to Dismiss, or (2) file a statement, no longer than 2 pages in length, certifying that they conferred with Plaintiff prior to filing their Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and setting forth the reasons why Court review of both sets of motions is necessary. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/6/2020. (bnp)
April 6, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Brief / Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint)(Stone, Kevin)
April 6, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Suntrust Bank. (Windham, Mark)
April 6, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Suntrust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A)(Windham, Mark)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
March 23, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff Zeal Global Services Private Limiteds Response to Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc,)s Motion to Dismiss filed by Zeal Global Services Private Limited. (Mikkelsen, Matthew)
March 23, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Zeal Global Services Private Limiteds Response to Suntrust Banks Motion to Dismiss filed by Zeal Global Services Private Limited. (Mikkelsen, Matthew)
March 23, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Zeal Global Services Private Limited.(Mikkelsen, Matthew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. This case-- including all deadlines for the Rule 26(f) Early Planning Conference, LR 16.1, the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, LR 16.2, and Initial Disclosures, LR 26.1-- is stayed, pending the Court's ruling on the motions to dismiss of Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and SunTrust Bank. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/23/2020. (bnp)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (bnp)
March 23, 2020 Submission of #12 Defendants' Joint MOTION to Stay to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/19/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
March 18, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth M. Briones Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Elizabeth M. Briones added appearing on behalf of Suntrust Bank (cdg)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/18/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
March 18, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Mary C. Zinsner Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Mary C. Zinsner added appearing on behalf of Suntrust Bank (nmb)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER AND NOTICE FOR ALL CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO DOCKET OF JUDGE TOTENBERG. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/17/2020. (rjs)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The Deadline for Zeal Global to file and serve responses to the Pending Motions [Docs. 5 and 9] shall be extended to and including March 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/16/2020. (bnp)
March 16, 2020 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responses to Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 5] and Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 9] re: #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #5 MOTION to Dismiss Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Zeal Global to Respond to Pending Motions to Dismiss by Zeal Global Services Private Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion)(Mikkelsen, Matthew)
March 13, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Mary C. Zinsner Pro Hac Vice.by Suntrust Bank. (Windham, Mark) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 12, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth M. Briones Pro Hac Vice.by Suntrust Bank. (Windham, Mark) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 11, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #2 Order, (Coulter, Benjamin)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/10/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
March 10, 2020 RETURN of #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Mary C. Zinsner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9450026). to attorney for correction re: Courts. (cdg)
March 10, 2020 RETURN of #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth M. Briones Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9449963). to attorney for correction re: Courts. (cdg)
March 10, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin B. Coulter Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Benjamin Brock Coulter added appearing on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.) (cdg)
March 5, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Mary C. Zinsner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9450026).by Suntrust Bank. (Windham, Mark) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 5, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth M. Briones Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9449963).by Suntrust Bank. (Windham, Mark) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 5, 2020 Filing 12 Defendants' Joint MOTION to Stay by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Stone, Kevin) Modified on 3/5/2020 to edit text(bnp).
March 5, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin B. Coulter Pro Hac Vice.by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Consent of Designated Local Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stone, Kevin) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 5, 2020 RETURN of #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin B. Coulter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9433929). to attorney for correction regarding form. (nmb)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin B. Coulter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9433929).by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Consent of Designated Local Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stone, Kevin) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Brief / Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Stone, Kevin)
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.) identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.). (Stone, Kevin)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #2 Order, (Stone, Kevin)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Pursuant to Doc #2 Standing Order in Cases Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg (Mikkelsen, Matthew)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Suntrust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Windham, Mark)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Suntrust Bank identifying Other Affiliate Truist Financial Corporation for Suntrust Bank by Suntrust Bank.(Windham, Mark)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #2 Order, (Windham, Mark)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/2/2020. (bnp)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.). (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9421260). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeal Global Services Private Limited v. Suntrust Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.)
Represented By: Benjamin Brock Coulter
Represented By: Kevin Robert Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Bank
Represented By: Mark James Windham
Represented By: Mary C. Zinsner
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Briones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeal Global Services Private Limited
Represented By: Andrew J. Becker
Represented By: Matthew Christopher Mikkelsen
Represented By: David Jason Merbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?