Syte-Visual Conception LTD v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Syte-Visual Conception LTD
Defendant: Slyce Acquisition Inc. and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00909
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.with Jury Demand filed by Syte-Visual Conception LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 928 Patent, #2 Exhibit B 688 Patent)(Lilenfeld, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Oral Order granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Gates. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/25/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Oral Order granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael Chibib. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/25/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
March 25, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Gates Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9501603).. Attorney Michael Chibib added appearing on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Slyce Acquisition Inc. (nmb)
March 25, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Chibib Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9501572).. Attorney Michael Chibib added appearing on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Slyce Acquisition Inc. (nmb)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/16/20.(aaq)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. and Slyce Acquisition Inc.'s deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Syte-Visual Conception Ltd.'s Original Complaint is extended up to and including May 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/23/2020. (tmf)
March 20, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Slyce Acquisition Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schoenthaler, Peter)
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Gates Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9501603).by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Slyce Acquisition Inc.. (Schoenthaler, Peter) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Chibib Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9501572).by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Slyce Acquisition Inc.. (Schoenthaler, Peter) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter F. Schoenthaler on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Slyce Acquisition Inc. (Schoenthaler, Peter)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Syte-Visual Conception LTD. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Lilenfeld, David)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Syte-Visual Conception LTD. Slyce Acquisition Inc. served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (Lilenfeld, David)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Oral Order granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Guy Yonay. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/5/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
March 4, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Guy Yonay Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9431860).. Attorney Guy Yonay added appearing on behalf of Syte-Visual Conception LTD (nmb)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Guy Yonay Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9431860).by Syte-Visual Conception LTD. (Lilenfeld, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/28/2020. (tmf)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (kt)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Slyce Acquisition Inc. (kt)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (kt)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Syte-Visual Conception LTD. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9421932) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Syte-Visual Conception LTD v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syte-Visual Conception LTD
Represented By: David M. Lilenfeld
Represented By: Robin L. Gentry
Represented By: Guy Yonay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slyce Acquisition Inc.
Represented By: Peter F. Schoenthaler
Represented By: Michael Chibib
Represented By: Matthew K. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Peter F. Schoenthaler
Represented By: Michael Chibib
Represented By: Matthew K. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?