Cassidy v. Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tracey Cassidy
Defendant: Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00913
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (ah)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Tracey Cassidy. Medical Data Systems, Inc. served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (Berry, Matthew)
March 3, 2020 Clerks Notation re: #2 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Chief Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 03/03/2020. (cmb)
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Medical Data Systems, Inc. (rlb)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Tracey Cassidy (Berry, Matthew)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Tracey Cassidy. (Berry, Matthew)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tracey Cassidy. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9423235) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1, #2 Exhibit -2, #3 Exhibit -3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cassidy v. Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Cassidy
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?