United States of America v. One 2018 Dodge Journey SE, VIN 3C4PDCAB8JT252375 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One 2013 Nissan Altima, VIN 1N4AL3AP6DC186260, One 2016 Dodge Journey SXT, VIN 3C4PDCBGXGT224226, One 2018 Dodge Journey SE, VIN 3C4PDCAB8JT253575, One 2012 Dodge Caravan SXT, VIN 2C4RDGCG1CR139156, One 2009 Nissan Maxima, VIN 1N4AA51E09C823800 and One 2012 Chevrolet Impala LTZ, VIN 2G1WC5E33C1209249
Claimant: Jordan Rates and Professional Auto Sales
Case Number: 1:2020cv00961
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Clarence Cooper
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 23 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 25, 2020 through June 2, 2020, by Michael John Brown. (Brown, Michael)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Stay through the closure of the related crimina l investigation and proceedings or until further order of this court. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 4/14/2020. (dob)
April 14, 2020 Filing 21 Consent MOTION to Stay by One 2009 Nissan Maxima, VIN 1N4AA51E09C823800, One 2012 Chevrolet Impala LTZ, VIN 2G1WC5E33C1209249, One 2012 Dodge Caravan SXT, VIN 2C4RDGCG1CR139156, One 2013 Nissan Altima, VIN 1N4AL3AP6DC186260, One 2016 Dodge Journey SXT, VIN 3C4PDCBGXGT224226, One 2018 Dodge Journey SE, VIN 3C4PDCAB8JT253575. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Strickler, Margaret)
April 14, 2020 Filing 20 CLAIM Verified by One 2009 Nissan Maxima, VIN 1N4AA51E09C823800, One 2012 Chevrolet Impala LTZ, VIN 2G1WC5E33C1209249, One 2012 Dodge Caravan SXT, VIN 2C4RDGCG1CR139156, One 2013 Nissan Altima, VIN 1N4AL3AP6DC186260, One 2016 Dodge Journey SXT, VIN 3C4PDCBGXGT224226, One 2018 Dodge Journey SE, VIN 3C4PDCAB8JT253575. (Strickler, Margaret)
April 13, 2020 Filing 19 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 04/12/2020. (Brown, Michael)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (dob)
March 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Speedy Tires & Auto Repair (Brown, Michael)
March 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Jordan Rates (Brown, Michael)
March 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Jordan Rates via Attorney Chelsea Thomas (Brown, Michael)
March 12, 2020 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed on 3/11/2020 (Arrested) for One 2018 Dodge Journey SE, VIN 3C4PDCAB8JT253575. (tcc)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed on 3/11/2020 (Arrested) for One 2016 Dodge Journey SXT, VIN 3C4PDCBGXGT224226. (tcc)
March 12, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed on 3/11/2020 (Arrested) for One 2013 Nissan Altima, VIN 1N4AL3AP6DC186260. (tcc)
March 12, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed on 3/11/2020 (Arrested) for One 2012 Dodge Caravan SXT, VIN 2C4RDGCG1CR139156. (tcc)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed on 3/11/2020 (Arrested) for 2012 Chevrolet Impala LTZ, VIN 2Gl WC5E33C1209249. (tcc)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed on 3/11/2020 (Arrested) for 2009 Nissan Maxima, VIN 1N4AA51E09C823800. (tcc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America. Warrant of arrest and notice of seizure issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One 2018 Dodge Journey SE, VIN 3C4PDCAB8JT252375 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2013 Nissan Altima, VIN 1N4AL3AP6DC186260
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2016 Dodge Journey SXT, VIN 3C4PDCBGXGT224226
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2018 Dodge Journey SE, VIN 3C4PDCAB8JT253575
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2012 Dodge Caravan SXT, VIN 2C4RDGCG1CR139156
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2009 Nissan Maxima, VIN 1N4AA51E09C823800
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2012 Chevrolet Impala LTZ, VIN 2G1WC5E33C1209249
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael John Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jordan Rates
Represented By: Margaret Strickler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Professional Auto Sales
Represented By: Margaret Strickler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?