Nazaire v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Nazaire
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00979
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Emmanuel Nazaire re #15 Notice (Other). (bnp)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 31, 2020 Submission of #11 MOTION to Stay Discovery to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (bnp)
March 30, 2020 Submission of #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (bnp)
March 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Emmanuel Nazaire re #14 Order. (bnp)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (bnp)
March 17, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Emmanuel Nazaire re #13 Order. (hfm)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AMENDING #12 ORDER AND NOTICE FOR ALL CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO DOCKET OF JUDGE TOTENBERG. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/17/20. (hfm)
March 17, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Emmanuel Nazaire re #12 Order. (rjs)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND NOTICE FOR ALL CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO DOCKET OF JUDGE TOTENBERG. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/17/2020. (rjs)
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Windham, Mark)
March 13, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Emmanuel Nazaire re #10 Order. (bnp)
March 13, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (bnp)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for TRO. As Plaintiff raises claims under TILA, FDCPA, FCRA and challenges an allegedly wrongful or attempted wrongful residential real property foreclosure, eviction, or dispossessory action, the Clerk is DIRECTED to REFER this matter to the next available Magistrate Judge pursuant to Standing Order No. 18-01. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/13/2020. (bnp)
March 12, 2020 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 3/12/2020 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Windham, Mark)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1-promissory note, #3 Exhibit 2- security deed, #4 Exhibit 3- assignments, #5 Exhibit 4- petition, #6 Exhibit 5- dismissal order, #7 Exhibit 6- petition)(Windham, Mark)
March 5, 2020 Clerks Approval re #6 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #3 Order, (Windham, Mark)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number BGANDC-9439108. (Windham, Mark)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Mortgage Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc. for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company; Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Windham, Mark)
March 4, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Emmanuel Nazaire re #4 Order. (bnp)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Defendants are DIRECTED to file a response to the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by NO LATER THAN Wednesday, March 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/4/2020. (bnp)
March 4, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Emmanuel Nazaire re #3 Standing Order. (bnp)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/4/2020. (bnp)
March 4, 2020 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Emmanuel Nazaire. (Originally filed in Cobb County Superior Court on 01/23/2020.) (bnp)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9439206) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nazaire v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Nazaire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Mark James Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Mark James Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?