TBR Stratford 1031 WA LLC v. Forbes
Plaintiff: TBR Stratford 1031 WA LLC
Defendant: Sara Forbes
Case Number: 1:2020cv01116
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
April 8, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sara Forbes re #8 Letter, #7 Order. (ddm)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 Letter to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County regarding the remand of this action to their court. (ddm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2020: #1 Acceptance of Filing by Fulton County) (ddm).
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving and adopting the #2 Final Report and Recommendation as the judgment of the Court and remanding this case to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/8/2020. (ddm)
April 7, 2020 Submission of #2 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm)
April 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sara Forbes re #6 Notice. (ddm)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sara Forbes re #5 Order. (ddm)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (ddm)
March 18, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sara Forbes re #2 Final Report and Recommendation, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (ddm)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #2 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 3/18/2020. (ddm)
March 18, 2020 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (contained within #2 ) recommending that this action be remanded to the Fulton County Magistrate Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 3/18/2020. (ddm)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Sara Forbes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying #1 Defendant's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and directing Defendant to pay the $400 within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 3/18/2020. (ddm)
March 16, 2020 Submission of the #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (aaq)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sara Forbes. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TBR Stratford 1031 WA LLC v. Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TBR Stratford 1031 WA LLC
Represented By: David Richard Passino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?