TA West Peachtree, LLC v. Blanket Homes Inc.
Plaintiff: TA West Peachtree, LLC
Defendant: Blanket Homes Inc.
Petitioner: Hilton Young
Case Number: 1:2020cv01131
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Certified Copy of #7 Order on Final Report and Recommendation electronically sent to Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. (bdb)
April 6, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (bdb)
April 6, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Blanket Homes Inc., Hilton Young re #7 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (bdb)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting #3 Final Report and Recommendation. The clerk is DIRECTED to remand this action to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 4/6/2020. (bdb)
April 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Blanket Homes Inc., Hilton Young re #6 Order. (tcc)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 24, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Blanket Homes Inc., Hilton Young re #5 Order. (tcc)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 IN RE: Court Operations Under The Exigent Circumstances Created By COVID-19 and Related Coronavirus. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (tcc)
March 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Blanket Homes Inc., Hilton Young re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Hilton Young. (tmf)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 3/18/2020. (tmf)
March 18, 2020 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Hilton Young. The Court RECOMMENDS that the application to proceed IFP, [Doc. #1 ], be DENIED and that this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge.Ruled on at #3 R&R by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 3/18/2020. (tmf)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Hilton Young Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 3/18/2020. (tmf)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Hilton Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 3/19/2020 to correct date (tmf).
March 17, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Hilton Young. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TA West Peachtree, LLC v. Blanket Homes Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hilton Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TA West Peachtree, LLC
Represented By: James M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanket Homes Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?