Sosa Castro v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Veronica Sosa Castro
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli, Denise Frazier, Chad Wolf and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2020cv01145
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (bnp)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE FOR ALL CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO DOCKET OF JUDGE TOTENBERG. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/17/2020. (rjs)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Zambrano, Shirley)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/16/2020. (bnp)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons Kenneth Cuccinelli, #3 Summons Denise Frazier, #4 Summons Chad Wolf)(bnp)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Veronica Sosa Castro (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Zambrano, Shirley)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Request for de novo review of naturalization) filed by Veronica Sosa Castro. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9473669) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A N-400 Decision, #2 Exhibit B N-336 Submission, #3 Exhibit C N-336 Receipt Notice, #4 Exhibit D N-336 Hearing Notice, #5 Exhibit E P.O. Box Statement, #6 Exhibit F Final Disposition and Related Documents, #7 Exhibit G N-336 Denial, #8 Exhibit H Affidavit, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sosa Castro v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Sosa Castro
Represented By: Shirley Cristina Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?