Thompson v. Niner
Plaintiff: Terrence Thompson
Defendant: Scott Niner
Case Number: 1:2020cv01275
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #9 Order, (Taube, Gregory)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on May 12, 2020. (ash)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Defendant's Motion to Stay Preliminary Pretrial Deadlines [ECF #6 ]. Good cause having been shown, the motion is GRANTED. All discovery, including initial disclosures, Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) conferences, and the joint preliminary report and discovery plan are hereby STAYED until the Court rules on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ECF #3 ]. If the motion to dismiss is denied, in whole or in part, the parties shall have 14 days from the date the order denying such motion is entered in which to file their respectiveinitial disclosures and the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 4/23/2020. (tmf)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Pretrial Deadlines with Brief In Support by Scott Niner. (Taube, Gregory)
April 17, 2020 Submission of #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Scott Niner. (Taube, Gregory)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Scott Niner. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A to Brief, #3 Exhibit B to Brief)(Taube, Gregory)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (bnp)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Scott Niner. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9505328) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Niner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Niner
Represented By: Erika C. Birg
Represented By: Gregory M. Taube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Thompson
Represented By: Ellen Angel Cordle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?