Williams v. Encore Credit Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sandra B. Williams
Defendant: Encore Credit Corporation, Rubin Lublin, LLC, Brett Chaness, Esq. and U. S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv01297
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:l332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE in writing within 14 days why this action should not be dismissed for failing to comply with an Order of the Court or return summonses and initial disclosure forms for each defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 5/19/2020. (dmb)
May 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sandra B. Williams re #10 Order to Show Cause,Forms sent to party: Summons; Initial Disclosures. (dmb)
May 19, 2020 Submission of #4 Order to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (dmb)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines by Brett Chaness, Esq, Encore Credit Corporation, Rubin Lublin, LLC, U. S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines)(Chaness, Bret)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brett Chaness, Esq, Encore Credit Corporation, Rubin Lublin, LLC, U. S. Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp for Encore Credit Corporation. (Chaness, Bret)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Brett Chaness, Esq, Encore Credit Corporation, Rubin Lublin, LLC, U. S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Chaness, Bret)
May 15, 2020 Clerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
May 5, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sandra B. Williams re #6 Notice (Other). (dmb)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
April 21, 2020 USM 285 Forms as to All Defendants Received by Clerk. (jed)
April 6, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sandra B. Williams re #3 Notice (Other). (dmb)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT filed by Sandra B. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2020: #2 Certificate of Compliance) (dmb).
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING request to proceed In Forma Pauperis. The case is allowed to proceed as any other Civil Action. The Clerk is directed to send USM 285 forms, Initial Disclosure Forms and Summons. Plaintiff is directed to complete service forms and return to Clerk within 21 days from entry date of this order. Upon receipt of forms, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare a service waiver package for each Defendant. In the event a Defendant does not return the Waiver of Service form to the Clerk of Court within 35 days following the date the service waiver package was mailed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshal's Service a service package for each Defendant who failed to return the waiver form. The Clerk is directed to resubmit if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 4/1/2020. (dmb)
April 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sandra B. Williams re #4 Order ruling on IFP, Order Allowing Case to Proceed, Order Directing Service by Clerk,,,, Set Submission Deadline, Forms sent to party: USM 285; Summons; Initial Disclosures; (dmb)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (eop)
March 27, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
March 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sandra B. Williams re #2 Order and NEF. (eop)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Sandra B. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Encore Credit Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encore Credit Corporation
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubin Lublin, LLC
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Chaness, Esq.
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?