James v. U. S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: George Samuel James
Respondent: U. S. Department of Homeland Security and U. S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv01475
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 Filing Fee Paid: $ 75, receipt number GAN100121719 (ah) (ah).
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 Memorandum of Materials for Relief Under Immigration and Nationality Act, by George Samuel James. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14, #8 Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit 16, #10 Exhibit 17, #11 Exhibit 18, #12 Exhibit 19, #13 Exhibit 20)(rvb)
June 1, 2020 Filing 9 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by George Samuel James. (rvb)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
May 14, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George Samuel James re #7 Order and Authorization and Affidavit form. (bdb)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing that Plaintiff must execute and return within 30 days, an Affidavit and Authorization allowing Custodian to withdraw funds from Inmate Account including an authorization allowing his custodian to withdraw funds from his custodial account and a properly completed certificate, signed by an authorized institutional officer, regarding the current balance in his custodial account or submit the remaining $395.00 he owes for the filing fee and administrative fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to forward the appropriate financial affidavit form to Plaintiff together with a copy of this Order. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned upon receipt of the balance of the filing fee or completed in forma pauperis form or at the expiration of the thirty-day period. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/14/2020. (bdb)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 Addendum to Supporting Memorandum re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by George Samuel James. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 2A, #3 Exhibit 1B)(ah)
May 6, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George Samuel James re #5 Notice (Other). (ah)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
April 16, 2020 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to District Judge William M. Ray II. (ah)
April 16, 2020 Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly terminated. (ah)
April 16, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George Samuel James re #4 Order. (ah)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned and to submit the matter to the District Judge. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to update the cause of action to 8:1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing, the nature of suit to 462 Naturalization Application, and the jurisdiction to U.S. Government Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 4/16/2020. (ah)
April 9, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George Samuel James re #3 Order. (rvb)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/30/2020. (rvb)
April 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George Samuel James re #2 Order and NEF. (eop)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (eop)
April 7, 2020 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by George Samuel James. ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number GAN 108120649.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit -Letter)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. U. S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U. S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U. S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Samuel James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?