Smith v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Janie Smith
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv01680
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction re #7 Affidavit of Service as to Social Security Administration by Janie Smith. (Hiller, Kenneth) Modified on 6/18/2020 to edit event(tmf). (tmf)
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service as to Social Security Administration by Janie Smith. (Hiller, Kenneth) Modified on 6/18/2020 to edit event(tmf).
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ida Comerford on behalf of Janie Smith (Comerford, Ida)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (eop)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Attorney General, #2 U. S. Attorney)(eop) Modified Issued Date on 4/22/2020 (eop).
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Janie Smith. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9611911) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified file date on 4/22/2020 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janie Smith
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Flynn
Represented By: Ida Comerford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?