Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Veloure' Restaurant & Lounge LLC and Joyerica Thomas
Case Number: 1:2020cv01951
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 23, 2020 Clerks Entry of Default as to Joyerica Thomas, Veloure' Restaurant & Lounge LLC. (kt)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit R Bruno)(Bruno, Richard)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Veloure' Restaurant & Lounge LLC served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Joyerica Thomas served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (eop)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Veloure' Restaurant & Lounge LLC. (eop)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Joyerica Thomas. (eop)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9669289) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veloure' Restaurant & Lounge LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyerica Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Richard S. Bruno
Represented By: Ronald David Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?