Talamantes v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Amanda L. Talamantes
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv02015
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Amanda L. Talamantes. Commissioner, Social Security Administration served on 5/18/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certified mail return receipts)(Hogan, John)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop)
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General and U. S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 W. Barr - Attorney General, #2 B. Pak - U. S. Attorney)(eop)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Amanda L. Talamantes. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9685643) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talamantes v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda L. Talamantes
Represented By: John Vincent Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?