Wright v. The TJX Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Susan Wright
Defendant: ABC Corp., John Doe 1-10, TJ Maxx, Inc., The TJX Companies, Inc. and XYZ Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02020
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Clarence Cooper
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The TJX Companies, Inc..(Noble, Robert)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 Initial Disclosures by The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Witness List, #2 Exhibit Document List, #3 Exhibit Insurance Agreement)(Noble, Robert)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 6/18/20. (bjh)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Joint Motion for Entry of Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order by TJ Maxx, Inc., The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Noble, Robert)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Noble, Robert)
June 11, 2020 Submission of #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court, to District Judge Clarence Cooper. (bjh)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response in Opposition filed by TJ Maxx, Inc., The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Noble, Robert)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Susan Wright. (Hait, Alexander)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Noble, Robert)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TJ Maxx, Inc., The TJX Companies, Inc.. Discovery ends on 10/19/2020.(Noble, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER dated 4/24/20 from Superior Court of Fulton County GRANTING Consent Motion to Substitute Parties. (RE: Defendant TJ Maxx, Inc. be substituted by The TJX Companies, Inc. in this case.)(eop)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9686863) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified filer's name on 5/13/2020 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. The TJX Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJ Maxx, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Ernest Noble, III
Represented By: Robert A. Luskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The TJX Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Ernest Noble, III
Represented By: Robert A. Luskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Wright
Represented By: Alexander Gray Hait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?