Stein v. Aarons, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shiva Stein
Defendant: Steven A. Michaels, Aarons Inc. and John W. Robinson, III
Petitioner: Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern Nevada
Case Number: 1:2020cv02030
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Herman on behalf of Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern Nevada (Herman, John)
May 12, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlton R. Jones on behalf of Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern Nevada (Jones, Carlton)
May 12, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Appoint NLP Enterprises, Inc., Trevor Davenport and Greg Stolworthy to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . filed by Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern Nevada. (Jones, Carlton)
May 12, 2020 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Persons by Aarons Inc., Steven A. Michaels, John W. Robinson, III. (Smith, Michael)
May 12, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #11 MOTION to Appoint NLP Enterprises, Inc., Trevor Davenport and Greg Stolworthy to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., #7 MOTION to Appoint Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern Nevada to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . filed by Aarons Inc., Steven A. Michaels, John W. Robinson, III. (Smith, Michael)
May 12, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Smith on behalf of Aarons Inc., Steven A. Michaels, John W. Robinson, III (Smith, Michael)
May 12, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany Marie Rezek on behalf of Aarons Inc., Steven A. Michaels, John W. Robinson, III (Rezek, Bethany)
May 12, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by B. Warren Pope on behalf of Aarons Inc., Steven A. Michaels, John W. Robinson, III (Pope, B.)
May 12, 2020 Submission of #7 MOTION to Appoint Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern Nevada to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #11 MOTION to Appoint NLP Enterprises, Inc., Trevor Davenport and Greg Stolworthy to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (aar)
May 12, 2020 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-01796. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 11, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of Georgia.(yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). NOW THEREFORE, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to transfer this action, immediately and in its entirety, to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/11/20) (yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Israel Dahan dated 5/11/2020 re: Consent transfer of this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Document filed by Aarons, Inc., Steven A. Michaels, John W. Robinson, III. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Transfer Action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a)).(Dahan, Israel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock Inc. for Aarons, Inc.. Document filed by Aarons, Inc...(Dahan, Israel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Israel Dahan on behalf of Aarons, Inc., Steven A. Michaels, John W. Robinson, III..(Dahan, Israel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
April 29, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #12 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
April 29, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #10 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support re: #11 MOTION to Appoint NLP Enterprises, Inc., Trevor Davenport and Greg Stolworthy to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Shiva Stein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Certs and Schedules, #3 Exhibit C - Damage Analysis, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume).(Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 MOTION to Appoint NLP Enterprises, Inc., Trevor Davenport and Greg Stolworthy to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Shiva Stein..(Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
April 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #10 Proposed Order, #12 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Shiva Stein..(Lieberman, Jeremy) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint NLP Enterprises, Inc., Trevor Davenport and Greg Stolworthy to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Shiva Stein..(Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern Nevada. Related Document Number: #7 ..(Rosenfeld, David) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of David A. Rosenfeld in Support re: #7 MOTION to Appoint Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern Nevada to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Estimate of losses).(Rosenfeld, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION to Appoint Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern Nevada to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern Nevada..(Rosenfeld, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern Nevada to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern Nevada..(Rosenfeld, David)[Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from David A. Rosenfeld dated April 28, 2020 re: Pre-Motion Conference Letter. Document filed by Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern Nevada..(Rosenfeld, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Shiva Stein..(Hood, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aarons, Inc., Steven A. Michaels, John W. Robinson, III..(sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
March 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
March 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Shiva Stein. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-18960672, paid on 2/28/2020..(sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aarons, Inc., John W. Robinson, III, and Steven A. Michaels, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Shiva Stein..(Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aarons, Inc., Steven A. Michaels, John W. Robinson, III. Document filed by Shiva Stein..(Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/12/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. Aarons, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern Nevada
Represented By: Carlton R. Jones
Represented By: John C. Herman
Represented By: David A. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Michaels
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: Michael R. Smith
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aarons Inc.
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: Michael R. Smith
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Robinson, III
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: Michael R. Smith
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiva Stein
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?