Galloway v. Transam Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tracy J. Galloway
Defendant: Transam Trucking, Inc., Jose R. Morales Ortiz and RLI Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02044
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 19, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tracy J. Galloway.(Horst, Michael)
June 17, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4(A) by Transam Trucking, Inc..(O'Daniel, Clay)
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tracy J. Galloway.(Horst, Michael)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 First Initial Disclosures by Tracy J. Galloway.(Horst, Michael)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Offer of Settlement by Jose R. Morales Ortiz, Transam Trucking, Inc..(O'Daniel, Clay)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Disclosures by Jose R. Morales Ortiz, Transam Trucking, Inc..(O'Daniel, Clay)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Discovery ends on 12/16/2020. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 5/28/2020. (dmb)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Jose R. Morales Ortiz, Transam Trucking, Inc.. (O'Daniel, Clay)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 5/19/20. (rsh)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jose R. Morales Ortiz, Transam Trucking, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Jacobson Holdings, Inc. for Transam Trucking, Inc. by Jose R. Morales Ortiz, Transam Trucking, Inc..(O'Daniel, Clay)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand to Plaintiff's Complaint by Jose R. Morales Ortiz, Transam Trucking, Inc.. Discovery ends on 10/16/2020.(O'Daniel, Clay) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/2020. (bnp)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Transam Trucking, Inc., Jose R. Morales Ortiz. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9691478) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galloway v. Transam Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy J. Galloway
Represented By: Zachary S. Shewmaker
Represented By: Michael W. Horst
Represented By: Zachary S Shewmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transam Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Purser
Represented By: Clay Seaton O'Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose R. Morales Ortiz
Represented By: Joel Purser
Represented By: Clay Seaton O'Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLI Insurance Company
Represented By: Joel Purser
Represented By: Clay Seaton O'Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?