Mohammed v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Farid Mohammed
Respondent: Thomas Giles, Chad Wolf, Ronald D. Vitiello, Patrick Gartland, Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kevin K. McAleenan and U. S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2020cv02170
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Regina D Cannon
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address for Farid Mohammed (jpa)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. RTS. No mail receptacle. Mail sent to Farid Mohammed re #4 Order. (bdb)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Return to Sender, No mail receptacle. Mail sent to Farid Mohammed re #3 Notice (Other). (bdb)
June 3, 2020 New Civil Action Number in USDC SDGA 5:20-cv-0071 (aar)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 Mail sent to Farid Mohammed re #2 Order returned as undeliverable. Marked: RTS; No Mail Receptacle; Unable to Forward. (bnp)
June 2, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon terminated from case. (tcc)
June 2, 2020 Case transferred electronically to District of USDC SD GA, Waycross Division. (tcc)
June 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Farid Mohammed re #4 Order. (tcc)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that this action, including all orders, motions, affidavits, pleadings, and exhibits filed herein (if any), is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, the Waycross Division. The Clerk is DIRECTED to withdraw the referral to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 6/2/2020. (tcc)
May 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Farid Mohammed re #3 Notice (Other). (tcc)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
May 26, 2020 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (eop)
May 26, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Farid Mohammed re #2 Order and NEF. (eop)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, titled, Emergency Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C.2241 and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Farid Mohammed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohammed v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D. Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Gartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U. S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Farid Mohammed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?