Nitetek Licensing LLC v. Castles Technology International Corp.
Plaintiff: Nitetek Licensing LLC
Defendant: Castles Technology International Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02297
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 7/13/2020 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 11, 2020 Clerks Approval re #7 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-9745541. (Burt, Jacqueline)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/1/2020. (tmf)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (tmf)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 Third Amendment IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDERTHE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/2020. (tmf)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Castles Technology International Corp.. (tmf)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nitetek Licensing LLC.(tmf)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT with Jury Demand filed by Nitetek Licensing LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9745562) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '105 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '783 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '105 Patent Claim Chart, #4 Exhibit D - '783 Patent Claim Chart, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nitetek Licensing LLC v. Castles Technology International Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castles Technology International Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nitetek Licensing LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Knapp Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?