GunUp, Inc. v. Urvan
Plaintiff: GunUp, Inc.
Defendant: Steve Urvan
Case Number: 1:2020cv02340
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by GunUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Manville, Duncan)
July 29, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by GunUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Manville, Duncan)
July 29, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by GunUp, Inc.. (Manville, Duncan)
July 13, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Steve Urvan. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Horst, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Stipulated Motion for Modified Briefing Schedule. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss due 7/13/2020; Plaintiff's Response due 7/29/2020; Defendant's Reply due 8/14/2020. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/6/2020. (bnp)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION Stipulated Motion for Modified Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss with Brief In Support by GunUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion)(Ingram, Robert)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/2/2020. (tmf)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 First JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by GunUp, Inc.. (Ingram, Robert)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case comes before the Court on Defendants Motion to Dismiss #4 . Plaintiff subsequently filed a First Amended Complaint as a matter of course. Dkt. No. #5 . Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #4 is now moot, as it seeks to dismiss a pleading that has been superseded. See Mizzaro v. The Home Depot, Inc., No. 1:06-cv-11510, 2007 WL 2254693, at *3 (N.D. Ga. July 19, 2007). Thus, Defendants Motion to Dismiss #4 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/30/2020. (tmf)
June 26, 2020 Submission of #4 MOTION to Dismiss , to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Oral Order granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Duncan E. Manville. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/25/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
June 25, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Duncan E. Manville Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9825514).. Attorney Duncan E. Manville added appearing on behalf of GunUp, Inc. (cdg)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Oral Order granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Patrick Moore. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/25/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
June 24, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Patrick Moore Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9825517). Attorney Patrick D. Moore added appearing on behalf of GunUp, Inc. (cdg)
June 24, 2020 Clerks Notation re #6 Certificate of Interested Persons read and approved by LMM. (rlb)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Patrick Moore Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9825517).by GunUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac)(Ingram, Robert) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Duncan E. Manville Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9825514).by GunUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac)(Ingram, Robert) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by GunUp, Inc.. (Ingram, Robert)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steve Urvan against GunUp, Inc.with Jury Demand filed by GunUp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B to First Amended Complaint)(Ingram, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Steve Urvan. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Horst, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/3/2020. (tmf)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Steve Urvan. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9753116) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Cobb Superior Filings, #2 Exhibit -2 -Declaration -Steve Urvan, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GunUp, Inc. v. Urvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Urvan
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Horst
Represented By: Joshua Ivan McLaurin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GunUp, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Donald Ingram
Represented By: David P. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?