Lewis v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kellie Lewis
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv02394
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Kellie Lewis. Commissioner, Social Security Administration served on 6/17/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Cates, Patrick)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Commissioner of Social Security, #2 Summons as to United States Attorney) (jed)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed by Kellie Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AC- Denial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 6/9/2020. (jed)
June 9, 2020 CLERK'S Notification of Reassignment to US Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Standing Order 07-02 re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-2394-LTW. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (jed)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop)
June 8, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (eop)
June 8, 2020 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kellie Lewis. (Cates, Patrick)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Kellie Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit - AC Denial, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summon(s) -3)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Lewis
Represented By: Patrick B. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?