Edible IP, LLC et al v. 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edible IP, LLC and Edible Arrangements LLC
Defendant: 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc. and 800-Flowers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02405
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 6, 2020 Filing 13 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Edible IP, LLC, Edible Arrangements LLC. 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc. waiver mailed on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; 800-Flowers, Inc. waiver mailed on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Waiver of Service)(Altman, Solesse)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Hollingsworth Hooker, III on behalf of 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc., 800-Flowers, Inc. (Hooker, Charles)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith Ann Powell on behalf of 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc., 800-Flowers, Inc. (Powell, Judith)
June 24, 2020 Submission of #6 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
June 9, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office re #8 A.O. Form 120. (rjs)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (rjs)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment A Listing All Trademarks, Trademark Dates and Holders)(Carter, Jason)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #5 Notice of Filing with Brief In Support by Edible Arrangements LLC, Edible IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Jason)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal Complaint by Edible Arrangements LLC, Edible IP, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unredacted Complaint)(Carter, Jason)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop)
June 8, 2020 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to 800-Flowers, Inc.. (eop)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc.. (eop)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Edible IP, LLC and Edible Arrangements LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9768026) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edible IP, LLC et al v. 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edible IP, LLC
Represented By: Solesse Lane Altman
Represented By: Jason James Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edible Arrangements LLC
Represented By: Solesse Lane Altman
Represented By: Jason James Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc.
Represented By: Judith Ann Powell
Represented By: Charles Hollingsworth Hooker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 800-Flowers, Inc.
Represented By: Judith Ann Powell
Represented By: Charles Hollingsworth Hooker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?