Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Mayer et al
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Silver Star Live Software, LLC, David Wayne Mayer and Silver Star FX, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02476
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Silver Star Live Software, LLC waiver mailed on 6/12/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Garcia, James)
June 30, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Silver Star FX, LLC waiver mailed on 6/12/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Garcia, James)
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Aimee Latimer-Zayets on behalf of Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Latimer-Zayets, Aimee)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James Anthony Garcia on behalf of Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Garcia, James)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. David Wayne Mayer served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Garcia, James)
June 16, 2020 RETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of James A. Garcia Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction. (cdg)
June 16, 2020 RETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Aimee Latimer-Zayets Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction. (cdg)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of James A. Garcia Pro Hac Vice.by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beranek, Lori) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Aimee Latimer-Zayets Pro Hac Vice.by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beranek, Lori) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 12, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction : Defendant Silver Star Live Software, LLC's name corrected on the record. (adg)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/12/20. (bnw)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/2020. (adg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Silver Star Live Software, LLC. (adg) Modified on 6/12/2020 (adg).
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Silver Star FX, LLC. (adg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to David Wayne Mayer. (adg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Mayer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Star Live Software, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wayne Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Star FX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Lori M. Beranek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?