Zipit Wireless, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation
Plaintiff: Zipit Wireless, Inc.
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv02487
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 AO Form 120 forwarded to Director of USPTO. (jpk)
June 25, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (jpk)
June 25, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (jpk)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Zipit Wireless, Inc. (Alexander, Cortney)
June 22, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction re #7 Return of Service Executed by Zipit Wireless, Inc. Microsoft Corporation served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Risley, Stephen) Modified on 6/22/2020 to edit date served and answer due date (jpk). (jpk)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Zipit Wireless, Inc. Microsoft Corporation served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Risley, Stephen) Modified on 6/22/2020 to edit date served and answer due date (jpk).
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
June 15, 2020 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures of Zipit Wireless, Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Zipit Wireless, Inc.. (Alexander, Cortney)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Third Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/2020. (jpk)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jpk)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Microsoft Corporation. (jpk)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Zipit Wireless, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9791190). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Form AO120 Report to Patent Office, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zipit Wireless, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zipit Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: Cortney Scott Alexander
Represented By: Stephen Robert Risley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?