Brown et al v. U.S. Bank National Association Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: George I. Brown and Pauline M. Brown
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association Mortgage and America's Servicing Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02499
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George I. Brown, Pauline M. Brown re #7 Notice (Other). (bnp)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 14, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George I. Brown, Pauline M. Brown re #6 Notice (Other). (bnp)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 8, 2020 Submission of #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (bnp)
July 6, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George I. Brown, Pauline M. Brown re #5 Notice (Other). (bnp)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by America's Servicing Company, U.S. Bank National Association Mortgage identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp (NYSE: USB) for U.S. Bank National Association Mortgage; Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company (WFC), Corporate Parent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for America's Servicing Company. (Ebbs, Arthur)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by America's Servicing Company, U.S. Bank National Association Mortgage. (Ebbs, Arthur)
June 16, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George I. Brown and Pauline M. Brown re #2 Order. (eop)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by U.S. Bank National Association Mortgage. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9793852) (NO TRO Needed, per Attorney) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Foreclosure Advertisement, #2 Exhibit -B -Security Deed, #3 Exhibit -C -Rockdale Superior Court Order, #4 Exhibit -D -Rockdale County Filings, #5 Exhibit -E -Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit -F -Notice of Removal to Plaintiffs, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/15/2020 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. U.S. Bank National Association Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George I. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association Mortgage
Represented By: Arthur Allen Ebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Servicing Company
Represented By: Arthur Allen Ebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?