Carruthers v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Carruthers
Defendant: Unknown Conspirators, Affiliates, Agents, Loan Care Servicing Center, Inc., James E. Albertelli, P.A., Richard Roes, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Loan Care, LLC, Jane Does, Loan Care, LLC doing business as Loan Care, Loan Care Servicing Center, Inc. doing business as Loan Care, James E. Albertelli, P.A. doing business as Albertelli Law doing business as ALAW and Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC via Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. as nominee for Impact Mortgage Corp., d/b/a Cashcall Mortgage assignee of Loan Care Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02502
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - On June 30, 2020, this removal action was transferred to the Newnan Division of the Northern District of Georgia [Doc. No #11 ]. On the same date the court received a motion for remand by the pro se plaintiff [Doc. No. #12 ]. The clerk filed the motion to remand in the instant case rather than in the Newnan case, 3:20-CV-108-TCB. The clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the pending status of the motion to remand in this action and file it as a pending motion in the Newnan action. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 7/2/2020. (tcc)
July 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard Carruthers re #13 Order. (tcc)
June 30, 2020 Filing 12 (Motion in Opposition to Defendant's Notice of State Case Removal construed by clerk as) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Richard Carruthers. (ah)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Because the court finds that the Atlanta Division is not the proper venue for this action, the clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this action to the Newnan Division pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 6/30/2020. (tcc)
June 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard Carruthers re #11 Order. (tcc)
June 30, 2020 Intradistrict Transfer to Newnan Division, new case number 3:20-cv-00108, Assigned to Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr.. (tcc)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #4 Order to Show Cause,,, filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Loan Care, LLC. (Chaness, Bret)
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Strike #3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Loan Care Servicing Center, Inc., Loan Care, LLC. (Chaness, Bret)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, and Loan Care, LLC, two of several named defendants, removed this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division from the Superior Court of Spalding County [Doc. No. #1 ]. However, the case involves property located in Spalding County, Georgia, which is located in the Newnan Division of the Northern District of Georgia. Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to show cause why this civil action should not be transferred to the Newnan Division pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The parties may respond jointly or separately. The response(s) shall be due no later than June 29, 2020. The clerk is DIRECTED to submit this action to the undersigned on June 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 6/15/2020. (tcc)
June 15, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard Carruthers re #4 Order to Show Cause. (tcc)
June 15, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard Carruthers re #8 Order. (eop)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION in Opposition #3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal; and Opposition #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Richard Carruthers. (Filed in Superior Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Strike #3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal); and #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Richard Carruthers. (Motion filed in Superior Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC and Loan Care, LLC. (Filed in Superior Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) Modified text on 6/15/2020 (eop).
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC and Loan Care, LLC. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James E. Albertelli, PA. Discovery ends on 11/9/2020. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Loan Care, LLC and Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9794946) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carruthers v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Conspirators, Affiliates, Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loan Care Servicing Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Albertelli, P.A.
Represented By: Cory Patrick Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Corey Tova Rothschild
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loan Care, LLC
Represented By: Corey Tova Rothschild
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loan Care, LLC doing business as Loan Care
Represented By: Corey Tova Rothschild
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loan Care Servicing Center, Inc. doing business as Loan Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Albertelli, P.A. doing business as Albertelli Law doing business as ALAW
Represented By: Cory Patrick Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC via Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. as nominee for Impact Mortgage Corp., d/b/a Cashcall Mortgage assignee of Loan Care Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Corey Tova Rothschild
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Carruthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?