Lumpkin v. Hedges
Plaintiff: Ericka Lumpkin
Defendant: McCall W. Hedges
Case Number: 1:2020cv02519
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Stay Case through and including 9/7/20, including Defendant's answer or responsive pleading. All other deadlines will be adjusted accordingly. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/5/20. (bjh)
August 5, 2020 Filing 14 Second MOTION to Stay (Joint Motion) by McCall W. Hedges. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rivera, Michelli)
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelli Rivera on behalf of McCall W. Hedges (Rivera, Michelli)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 Clerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay through and including August 14, 2020, including Defendant's answer or responsive pleading. All other deadlines will be adjusted accordingly. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/9/2020. (dob)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by McCall W. Hedges. (Simpson, Matthew)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay by McCall W. Hedges. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simpson, Matthew)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 25, 2020 Set Deadline: McCall W. Hedges' answer due 7/13/2020. (bjh)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing by Ericka Lumpkin Proof of Service [McCall W. Hedges] (Sparks, John)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 6/16/20. (bjh)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to McCall W. Hedges. (eop)
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ericka Lumpkin. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9800421) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lumpkin v. Hedges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ericka Lumpkin
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCall W. Hedges
Represented By: Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Represented By: Michelli Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?