Fullerton v. LG Chem, Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Ethan Fullerton
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc. and LG Chem, Ltd
Case Number: 1:2020cv02653
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Submission of #21 MOTION to Dismiss, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (bdb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY BRIEF re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LG Chem, Ltd. (North, Richard)
August 17, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Hedley, Rachel)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Rachel Atkin Hedley as to LG Chem, Ltd. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/10/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
August 10, 2020 NOTICE CHANGING TIME re #26 : Time of oral argument hearing reset to 01:00 PM on 09/03/2020. Approved by SDG. (ash)
August 6, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT - Notice is hereby given that the Court has set a hearing for Thursday, September 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Steven D. Grimberg, in Courtroom 1707, Richard B. Russell Federal Building, 75 Ted Turner Drive, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia 30303 for argument on Defendant LG Chem, Ltd's Motion to Dismiss. Argument on the pending motion will be limited to 45 minutes for each side. Due to the current public health emergency, the parties may appear in person or via remote audio and video means, at their preference. The dial-in instructions are as follows: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1605532184; meeting ID: 1605532184; passcode: 912052; dial in number: (646) 828-7666. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/6/2020. (tcc)
August 5, 2020 Filing 25 Supplemental Brief in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ethan Fullerton. (tcc)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's motion to file its supplemental response [ECF #18 ] and, for good cause shown, GRANTS the motion. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter ECF 18-1 as Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to LG Chem, Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss [ECF #21 ]. To the extent Defendant LG Chem, Ltd. wishes to file a supplemental reply brief, it is ORDERED to do so by August 19, 2020. Further, the Court finds that oral argument on the motion to dismiss would be beneficial. The Court will schedule the argument on a date and time to be determined. With regard to LG Chem America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss [ECF #3 ] and Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the Complaint [ECF #8 ], the Court finds that these motions are now moot because the parties entered a joint stipulation dismissing LG Chem America, Inc. from the case on June 26, 2020 [ECF #11 ]. Accordingly, these motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/5/2020. (tcc)
August 4, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachel Atkin Hedley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9981581).. Attorney Rachel Atkin Hedley added appearing on behalf of LG Chem, Ltd (cdg)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachel Atkin Hedley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9981581).by LG Chem, Ltd. (North, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to LG Chem, Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Ethan Fullerton. (Nehmens, Angela) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2020: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Response) (bdb).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice of Prior Orders of this Court Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission to William A. Levin and Angela J. Nehmens [ECF 9]. The previously granted Pro Hac Vice Applications of Angela J. Nehmens and William A. Levin in Civil Action Case Number 1:19-cv-04979-MHC shall be incorporated into the record for this case. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to add Angela J. Nehmens and William A. Levin at attorneys of record for Plaintiff Ethan Fullerton. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 7/21/2020. (rjs)
July 13, 2020 Submission of #3 MOTION to Dismiss, #8 MOTION to Amend #1 Notice of Removal to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Early Case Deadlines. LG Chem, Ltd.'s deadline to respond to Plaintiff's #13 First Amended Complaint is extended until fourteen (14) days after the Court has issued a ruling on LG Chem's pending #3 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, if LG Chem has not been dismissed. The Parties' exchange of Initial Disclosures and the Parties' submission of a Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan is extended until ten (10) days after LG Chem, Ltd. files its response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, if any. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 7/8/2020. (jed)
July 7, 2020 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time of Early Case Deadlines with Brief In Support by LG Chem, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Consent Motion to Extend Case Deadlines, #2 Text of Proposed Order Extending Case Deadlines)(North, Richard)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem, Ltdwith Jury Demand filed by Ethan Fullerton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A: Declaration of Angela J. Nehmens)(Nehmens, Angela) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (adg) (ADI)
June 29, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #11 Stipulation of Dismissal as to LG Chem America, Inc. pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (jed)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal of LG Chem America, Inc. by Ethan Fullerton. (Nehmens, Angela)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (North, Richard)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Ethan Fullerton PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF PRIOR ORDERS OF THIS COURT (Nehmens, Angela)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on June 25, 2020. (ash)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by LG Chem, Ltd. (North, Richard)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, REQUEST for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Ethan Fullerton. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by LG Chem America, Inc.. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Brief)(eop)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LG Chem America, Inc.. Discovery ends on 11/20/2020. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by LG Chem, Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9829445) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Order, #2 Exhibit -B -State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit -C -2019 Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit -D -LGC MTD Briefing, #5 Exhibit -E -Order to Show Cause, #6 Exhibit -F -LGC's Response to 5/6/20 Orde, #7 Exhibit -G -Remand Order, #8 Exhibit -H -Email, #9 Certificate of Service, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fullerton v. LG Chem, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Harris Campbell
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Steven H Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem, Ltd
Represented By: Steven Harris Campbell
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel Atkin Hedley
Represented By: Steven H Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Fullerton
Represented By: David A. Sleppy
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Mahzad Hite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?