TURNER v. BOUDREAUX et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner
Defendant: GLORIA MCCARTHY, SHELLY SCHWAEGAL and GAIL BOUDREAUX
Case Number: 1:2020cv02658
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Submission of the #10 MOTION for Default Judgment to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (aaq)
August 5, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Turner re #9 Sixth Amended Order. (kt)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment by Terrance Turner. (jpa)
July 14, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Turner RE: #8 Fifth Admin Order. (aaq)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (adg) (ADI)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:20-cv-00193. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 23, 2020 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 7/7/2020. (tam) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/24/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 6/22/2020. (chc) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/24/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by TERRANCE TURNER. (tam) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/24/2020.]
June 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why case should not be dismissed or transferred for lack of proper venue. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 6/13/2020. (TES) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/24/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to TERRANCE TURNER. (tam) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/24/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing Fee $ 400, Receipt Number GAM500035726,filed by TERRANCE TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Notice of a lawsuit and a request to waive service of a summons, #2 Notice of a lawsuit and a request to waive service of a summons, #3 Waiver of the service of summons, #4 Attachment, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Envelope)(tam) Modified to correct filed date on 5/20/2020 (tam). [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/24/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TURNER v. BOUDREAUX et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLORIA MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELLY SCHWAEGAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAIL BOUDREAUX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?