Kiss et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Michael J. Kiss and Bonnie L. Kortes
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02686
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 New Civil Action Number in USDC 3:20-cv-4838 (aar)
July 16, 2020 Case electronically transferred to Northern District of California. MDL no. 2741. (ah)
July 16, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (ah)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-222 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation requesting transfer to Northern District of California for inclusion in MDL number 2741. (ah)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Bonnie L. Kortes, Michael J. Kiss. Monsanto Company served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Pope, N.)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (adg) (ADI)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 7/1/2020. (bdb)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (bdb)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/2020. (bdb)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Bonnie L. Kortes, Michael J. Kiss. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9839243) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiss et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Kiss
Represented By: N. Kirkland Pope
Represented By: Joshua Adam Karr
Represented By: Caroline Gray McGlamry
Represented By: Michael Lee McGlamry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie L. Kortes
Represented By: N. Kirkland Pope
Represented By: Joshua Adam Karr
Represented By: Caroline Gray McGlamry
Represented By: Michael Lee McGlamry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?