Wilco Life Insurance Company v. Hamby et al.
Plaintiff: Wilco Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Victor Hamby and Kathleen Allen Shull
Case Number: 1:2020cv02688
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (adg) (ADI)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/1/20. (bnw)
June 30, 2020 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons APPROVED by JPB. (bnw)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Wilco Life Insurance Company. (Moore, Jamie)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilco Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Wilton Reassurance Company for Wilco Life Insurance Company. (Moore, Jamie)
June 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (rvb)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Victor Hamby, Kathleen Allen Shull. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Kathleen Allen Shull)(rvb)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Wilco Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9839264.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilco Life Insurance Company v. Hamby et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilco Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jamie L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Hamby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allen Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?