Dudar v. Department of Community Affairs
Plaintiff: Abdur-Rahim Dib Dudar
Defendant: Department of Community Affairs, Olantrp, Georgia Department of Community Affairs, David Samloff, Beth Eavenson, Ryan Smith, Eugenia Mitchem Whitted, Tifini Wynn, Stephanie Mitchell and Henry Oliver
Case Number: 1:2020cv02719
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Abdur-Rahim Dib Dudar re #9 Order. (tcc)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The plaintiff is ORDERED to cease his attempts to remove the underlying action to this court. Further attempts by the plaintiff to impermissibly remove the underlying action will be met with sanctions. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 7/17/2020. (tcc)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 Certified copy of #4 Order e-filed with the Clerk of Court, Superior Court of Fulton County. (tcc)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Rejected. Mail sent to Superior Court of Fulton County re #4 Remand Order. (adg)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing Second Notice of Removal by Abdur-Rahim Dib Dudar (jpk)
June 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Abdur-Rahim Dib Dudar re #4 Order, #5 Letter. (tcc)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 Certified copy of #4 Order mailed to the Clerk of Court, Superior Court of Fulton County. (tcc)
June 30, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The Clerk is DIRECTED to remand this action to the Superior Court of Fulton County. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 6/30/2020. (tcc)
June 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Abdur-Rahim Dib Dudar re #3 Order. (eop)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop)
June 26, 2020 Remark: Mr. Dudar stated that the Original Complaint from Fulton County Superior Court (2018CV313900)was was not included with the Notice of Removal. (eop)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Georgia Department of Community Affairs, Eugenia Mitchem Whitted, Stephanie Mitchell, Olantrp, David Samloff, Ryan Smith, Tifini Wynn, Beth Eavenson and Henry Oliver filed by Abdur-Rahim Dib Dudar. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Abdur-Rahim Dib Dudar. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number GAN100122344) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal -Part -2, #2 Table of Contents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudar v. Department of Community Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Community Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olantrp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Community Affairs
Represented By: Keilani Kimes-Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Samloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Eavenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugenia Mitchem Whitted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tifini Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdur-Rahim Dib Dudar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?