Stepp et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Stepp and Mark Sallee
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.) and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02788
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Mark Sallee, Brenda Stepp re #11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,. (tmf)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have up to and including September 4, 2020 to answer, move or otherwise respond pursuant to Fed R Civ P. 12 to the Complaint filed by Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs and Defendants shall have up to and including September 28, 2020 to serve their respective initial disclosures pursuant to Local Rule 26.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 8/17/2020. (tmf)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGinnis, Shanon)
August 4, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Mark Sallee, Brenda Stepp re #9 Notice (Other). (tmf)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 29, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Brenda Stepp and Mark Sallee re #8 Order. (rjs)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have up to and including August 21, 2020 to answer, move or otherwise respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 7/29/2020. (rjs)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and All Parties' Initial Disclosure Deadline by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Second Consent Motion)(McGinnis, Shanon)
July 14, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Mark Sallee, Brenda Stepp re #6 Notice (Other). (tmf)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Mark Sallee, Brenda Stepp re #5 Order. (rvb)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Consent Motion to Extend Defendants' Response Deadline. Defendants shall have up to and including August 7, 2020 to answer, move or otherwise respond. Plaintiffs and Defendants shall have up to and including August 31, 2020 to serve their respective initial disclosures Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 07/02/2020. (rvb)
July 2, 2020 Submission of #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (tmf)
July 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Mark Sallee, Brenda Stepp re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,. (tmf)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly: To the extent Plaintiffs request a TRO in their complaint [ #1 -1], that request is DENIED. As Plaintiffs' complaint concerns an allegedly wrongful residential real property foreclosure, the Clerk is DIRECTED to refer this case to a magistrate judge for all future pretrial matters pursuant to Standing Order 18-01. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/2/2020. (tmf)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion To Extend Defendants Response Deadline)(McGinnis, Shanon)
July 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Mark Sallee, Brenda Stepp re #2 Order. (tmf)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 Fourth Amendment IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/1/2020. (tmf)
July 2, 2020 Submission of #1 Notice of Removal,,, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT (including request for injunctive relief from foreclosure) filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.). (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9860876) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stepp et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.)
Represented By: Shanon J. McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Shanon J. McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Sallee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?