Jones et al v. Hill et al
Plaintiff: Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins, Rhonda Jones and Randolph Mitchell
Defendant: Kevin Thomas, Terrance Gibson, Maurice Johnson, Roland Boehrer and Victor Hill
Case Number: 1:2020cv02791
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: J P Boulee
2 Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roland Boehrer, Terrance Gibson, Victor Hill, Maurice Johnson, Kevin Thomas.(Sabzevari, Arash)
August 24, 2020 Submission of #20 MOTION for Hearing re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (ddm)
August 17, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 First MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins. (Primerano, Ryan)
August 17, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Clayton County Sheriff's Office Request for Proposal No. SO-02)(Cutting, Jeremy)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for a page-limit extension, (Doc. 33), is GRANTED. Plaintiffs may file a brief of up to 35 pages in length in response to Defendants' motion to dismiss, and Defendants may file a reply brief of up to 25 pages in length. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 8/14/20. (jtj)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #21 Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery. At this time, this Court will not determine the exact scope of the permissible discovery or the corresponding deadlines to complete discovery. Discovery, however, shall not be broader than that requested in the Motion for Expedited Discovery. No later than August 21, 2020, the parties are to meet and confer to determine the proper scope of the allowable discovery pursuant to this Court's Standing Order. Defendants; Motion to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, or in the alternative, Motion for Extension of Time #28 is granted in part. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction no later than August 31, 2020. Plaintiffs' reply, if any, shall be filed no later than September 14, 2020. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/14/2020. (ddm)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/14/20. (bnw)
August 13, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief In Support by Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages)(Primerano, Ryan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY BRIEF re #28 MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Roland Boehrer, Terrance Gibson, Victor Hill, Maurice Johnson, Kevin Thomas. (Sabzevari, Arash)
August 10, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: CorrectHealth June Statistical Report)(Primerano, Ryan)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: This Court HEREBY ORDERS expedited briefing on Defendants' #28 Motion to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendants' Motion to Stay no later than noon on August 10, 2020. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed no later than the close of business on August 11, 2020. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/6/20. (bnw)
August 4, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Roland Boehrer, Terrance Gibson, Victor Hill, Maurice Johnson, Kevin Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion for Expedited Discovery)(Sabzevari, Arash)
August 4, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Hearing re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Roland Boehrer, Terrance Gibson, Victor Hill, Maurice Johnson, Kevin Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion for Expedited Hearing)(Sabzevari, Arash)
August 4, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Roland Boehrer, Terrance Gibson, Victor Hill, Maurice Johnson, Kevin Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Staying Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time)(Sabzevari, Arash)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, the #26 Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants response in opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction may exceed the page limit by ten additional pages for a total of thirty-five pages. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/4/20. (bnw)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 3, 2020 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Brief in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Roland Boehrer, Terrance Gibson, Victor Hill, Maurice Johnson, Kevin Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sabzevari, Arash)
August 3, 2020 Filing 25 First MOTION to Stay Discovery with Brief In Support by Roland Boehrer, Terrance Gibson, Victor Hill, Maurice Johnson, Kevin Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sabzevari, Arash)
August 3, 2020 Filing 24 First Certificate of Interested Persons by Roland Boehrer, Terrance Gibson, Victor Hill, Maurice Johnson, Kevin Thomas. (Sabzevari, Arash)
August 3, 2020 Filing 23 First MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Roland Boehrer, Terrance Gibson, Victor Hill, Maurice Johnson, Kevin Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit)(Sabzevari, Arash)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Eleanor L. Ross recused. Case reassigned to Judge J. P. Boulee for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-CV-02791-JPB-CCB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/28/2020. (jpk)
July 27, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Discovery , MOTION to Expedite Discovery with Brief In Support by Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery, #2 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs Proposed Written Discovery, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Request for Expedited Discovery)(Cutting, Jeremy)
July 27, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Hearing re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins. (Cutting, Jeremy)
July 27, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A: Declaration of Nina H. Fefferman, Ph.D, #3 Exhibit B: Declaration of Fred Rottnek, M.D., #4 Exhibit C: Declaration of Emmitt L. Sparkman, #5 Exhibit D: Declarations of 12 Current or Recent Detainees, #6 Exhibit E: Email from E. Cross to Defendants, Mar. 13, 2020, #7 Exhibit F: Email from Sheriff Victor Hill, Mar. 17, 2020, #8 Exhibit G: Records from Clayton County Health District, #9 Exhibit H: Records from CorrectHealth, LLC, #10 Exhibit I: Detainee Grievances, #11 Exhibit J: Assorted COVID-19 Records from Clayton Cty. Sheriffs Office, #12 Exhibit K: Clayton Cty. Sheriffs Office Advisory, Jul. 2, 2020, #13 Exhibit L: CDC Interim Guidance, #14 Exhibit M: Ga. Dept of Public Health Interim Guidance, #15 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Cutting, Jeremy)
July 24, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorney Brandon Buskey as to Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton and Barry Watkins regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brandon Buskey. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/24/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
July 24, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Brandon Buskey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9924715).. Attorney Brandon Buskey added appearing on behalf of Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins (nmb)
July 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Leave of Absence for the following dates: July 27, 2020 - July 31, 2020 by Roland Boehrer, Terrance Gibson, Victor Hill, Maurice Johnson, Kevin Thomas (Hancock, Jack) Modified on 7/22/2020 to edit text and add dates (jpk).
July 20, 2020 Submission of #7 MOTION to Certify Class to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jpk)
July 17, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorneys Stephen Pevar and Robert Hunter as to Michael Singleton and Barry Watkins regarding Order(s) on Application for Admission PHVs. (mlb)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert W. Hunter. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/17/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
July 17, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert W. Hunter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9916569).. Attorney Robert W. Hunter added appearing on behalf of Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins (nmb)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen Pevar. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/17/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
July 17, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen Pevar Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9916491).. Attorney Stephen L. Pevar added appearing on behalf of Rhonda Jones (nmb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Brandon Buskey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9924715).by Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins. (Tucker, Kosha) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 16, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorney David C. Fathi as to Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton and Barry Watkins regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David C. Fathi. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/16/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
July 16, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of David Fathi Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9910935).. Attorney David C. Fathi added appearing on behalf of Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins (nmb)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs may file an additional ten (10) pages - for a total of thirty-five (35) pages - to its forthcoming Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/15/2020. (jpk)
July 15, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert W. Hunter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9916569).by Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins. (Tucker, Kosha) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen Pevar Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9916491).by Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins. (Tucker, Kosha) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Reynolds Hancock on behalf of Roland Boehrer, Terrance Gibson, Victor Hill, Maurice Johnson, Kevin Thomas (Hancock, Jack)
July 14, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of David Fathi Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9910935).by Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins. (Geraghty, Sarah) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Arash A. Sabzevari on behalf of Roland Boehrer, Terrance Gibson, Victor Hill, Maurice Johnson, Kevin Thomas (Sabzevari, Arash)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief In Support by Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins. (Primerano, Ryan)
July 9, 2020 Submission of #8 Order and #1 Complaint to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jed)
July 9, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jed)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' request for preliminary injunctive relief. Furthermore, because Plaintiffs' Complaint seeks habeas corpus relief pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 and 2243, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to refer this case to a Magistrate Judge pursuant to Standing Order 18-01. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/9/2020. (jed)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Certify Class with Brief In Support by Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class)(Primerano, Ryan)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing by Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declarations of Named Plaintiffs Currently Incarcerated in the Clayton County Jail, #2 Exhibit B: Redacted Declarations of People Currently Incarcerated in or Recently Released from the Clayton County Jail)(Cutting, Jeremy)
July 2, 2020 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton and Barry Watkins. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
July 2, 2020 Submission of #1 Complaint,, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (tmf)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 Fourth Amendment IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDERTHE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/1/2020. (tmf)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Roland Boehrer, Terrance Gibson, Victor Hill, Maurice Johnson, Kevin Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Summons Gibson, #2 Summons Hill, #3 Summons Johnson, #4 Summons Thomas)(tmf)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rhonda Jones, Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Barry Watkins. (tmf)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (request for injunctive relief found within) filed by Randolph Mitchell, Michael Singleton, Rhonda Jones, Barry Watkins. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9861789) (Attachments: #1 Statement of Related Case, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 7/2/2020 to edit text(tmf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Thomas
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Represented By: Jacob Loken
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Gibson
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Represented By: Jacob Loken
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Johnson
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Represented By: Jacob Loken
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Boehrer
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Represented By: Jacob Loken
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Hill
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Represented By: Jacob Loken
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Singleton
Represented By: Sarah E. Geraghty
Represented By: Jeremy Dakota Cutting
Represented By: Ryan Primerano
Represented By: Kosha Shonyetta Tucker
Represented By: Stephen L. Pevar
Represented By: Brandon Jerel Buskey
Represented By: Robert W. Hunter
Represented By: David C. Fathi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Watkins
Represented By: Sarah E. Geraghty
Represented By: Jeremy Dakota Cutting
Represented By: Ryan Primerano
Represented By: Kosha Shonyetta Tucker
Represented By: Brandon Jerel Buskey
Represented By: Robert W. Hunter
Represented By: David C. Fathi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Jones
Represented By: Sarah E. Geraghty
Represented By: Jeremy Dakota Cutting
Represented By: Ryan Primerano
Represented By: Kosha Shonyetta Tucker
Represented By: Stephen L. Pevar
Represented By: Brandon Jerel Buskey
Represented By: Robert W. Hunter
Represented By: David C. Fathi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Mitchell
Represented By: Sarah E. Geraghty
Represented By: Jeremy Dakota Cutting
Represented By: Ryan Primerano
Represented By: Kosha Shonyetta Tucker
Represented By: Stephen L. Pevar
Represented By: Brandon Jerel Buskey
Represented By: Robert W. Hunter
Represented By: David C. Fathi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?