Fee et al v. Volvo Group North America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tonya Fee and Jack Ross Fee, Jr.
Defendant: Volvo Group North America, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Richard J. Bernard, III and John Does 1-3
Intervenor Plaintiff: Liberty Insurance Corporation and Mohawk Carpet Transportation Company of Georgia, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02802
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Submission of #12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court , to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
August 24, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF re #12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jack Ross Fee, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bernard LinkedinProfile)(Conley, Cale)
August 21, 2020 Filing 18 Amended MOTION to Intervene on behalf of Liberty Insurance Corporation with Brief In Support by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief ISO Amended Motion to Intervene obo Liberty Insurance, #2 Exhibit A-PropIntervenorComplaint obo LIberty Insurance, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wingfield, Thomas)
August 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Mohawk Carpet Transportation Company of Georgia, LLC re #16 MOTION to Intervene Mohawk Carpet Transportation Company of Georgia LLC's Notice of Withdrawal of its Motion to Intervene (Wingfield, Thomas)
August 18, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Intervene with Brief In Support by Liberty Insurance Corporation, Mohawk Carpet Transportation Company of Georgia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Intervenor Complaint)(Slemons, Dale)
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brewer v. Merritt Equipment Co., Civil Action No. 5:19-cv-31 (S.D. Ga. July 31, 2019 Order))(Keith, Christopher)
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Richard J. Bernard, III, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard J. Bernard, III)(Arndt, Patrick)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Jack Ross Fee, Jr and Tonya Fee. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Brief in Support of Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Brief in Support of Motion to Remand)(Conley, Cale) Modified on 7/29/2020 to add filer(bnp).
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): August 10, 2020 through and including September 1, 2020, October 19, 2020 through and including October 26, 2020, by Michael David Hostetter. (Hostetter, Michael)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon a Consent Motion of the Parties to Stay Federal Court Deadlines Pending Ruling on Motion to Remand. Having considered the motion, and given that the parties consent to this motion, it is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs are directed to timely file their motion to remand, and any deadlines required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or Local Rules of this Court are stayed until such time as the Motion to Remand is ruled upon by this Court. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/21/2020. (tmf)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Stay by Jack Ross Fee, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Conley, Cale)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant Volvo Group North America, LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Volvo Group North America, LLC.(Fox, Warner) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 8, 2020 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons and #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement read and approved by LMM. (rlb)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Volvo Group North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mack Trucks, Inc., Corporate Parent VNA Holding Inc., Corporate Parent AB Volvo for Volvo Group North America, LLC by Volvo Group North America, LLC.(Keith, Christopher)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Richard J. Bernard, III, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. identifying Other Affiliate Penske Automotive Group, Other Affiliate Mutsui & Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Penske Corp. for Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.. (Arndt, Patrick)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Richard J. Bernard, III, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.. Discovery ends on 12/7/2020.(Arndt, Patrick) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/7/2020. (bnp)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/1/20. (eop)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. and Richard J. Bernard, III. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9870508) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Complaint, #2 Exhibit -B -Summons -Volvo, #3 Exhibit -C -Summons -Penske, #4 Exhibit -D -Summons -Bernard, #5 Attorney Verification -Volvo, #6 Attorney Verification -Penske & Bernard, #7 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal, #8 Affidavit of Filing State Court Notice of Removal, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fee et al v. Volvo Group North America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Group North America, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Nish Arndt
Represented By: Michael David Hostetter
Represented By: Warner S. Fox
Represented By: Christopher Shane Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.
Represented By: Patrick Nish Arndt
Represented By: Michael David Hostetter
Represented By: Warner S. Fox
Represented By: Christopher Shane Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Bernard, III
Represented By: Patrick Nish Arndt
Represented By: Michael David Hostetter
Represented By: Warner S. Fox
Represented By: Christopher Shane Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Fee
Represented By: John Robert McCown
Represented By: Scott A. Farrow
Represented By: Christopher Ross George
Represented By: Cale Howard Conley
Represented By: Carl Mark Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Ross Fee, Jr.
Represented By: John Robert McCown
Represented By: Scott A. Farrow
Represented By: Christopher Ross George
Represented By: Cale Howard Conley
Represented By: Carl Mark Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Dale E Slemons
Represented By: Thomas Kearney Wingfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mohawk Carpet Transportation Company of Georgia, LLC
Represented By: Dale E Slemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?