Estrada v. The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Estrada
Defendant: The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack, Inc. a Foreign Profit Corporation doing business as Pep Boys
Case Number: 1:2020cv02948
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - It is ORDERED that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this action. If this matter is not reopened by the parties within sixty (60) days it will be deemed to have been dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/10/2020. (tcc)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Michael Estrada (Pope, Matthew)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack, Inc. Answer due 9/10/2020. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/3/2020. (rjs)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Watstein, Ryan)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Michael Estrada. The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack, Inc. served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Pope, Matthew)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Michael Estrada. (eop)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack, Inc.. (eop)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Estrada. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9916274) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estrada v. The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack, Inc. a Foreign Profit Corporation doing business as Pep Boys
Represented By: Matthew N. Pope
Represented By: Ryan D. Watstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Estrada
Represented By: Matthew N. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?