Herring v. Allconnect, Inc.
Plaintiff: Naomi Herring
Defendant: Allconnect, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02950
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Regina D Cannon
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery (Plaintiffs First Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Allconnect, Inc.) by Naomi Herring.(Miller, Adian)
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery (Plaintiffs First Interrogatories to Defendant Allconnect, Inc.) by Naomi Herring.(Miller, Adian)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #12 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 3/5/2021. Summary Judgment Motions due by 4/5/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/5/2021. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including, in extreme cases, dismissal of this action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this action by Monday, April 12, 2021, if the parties have not filed a Motion for Summary Judgment or Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 9/8/2020. (bdb)
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 Initial Disclosures by Naomi Herring.(Miller, Adian)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 Joint JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Allconnect, Inc.. (Lu, Philip)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 Initial Disclosures by Allconnect, Inc..(Lu, Philip)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 8/28/2020. (bdb)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Naomi Herring. (Miller, Adian)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allconnect, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate New Imagitas, Inc., Other Affiliate Red Ventures Holdco, LP for Allconnect, Inc. by Allconnect, Inc..(Hill, Owen) Modified on 8/6/2020 to correct docket text 8/6/2020 (adg).
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Allconnect, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/4/2021.(Hill, Owen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Naomi Herring. Allconnect, Inc. served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Miller, Adian)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Allconnect, Inc.. (eop)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Naomi Herring. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9916543) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herring v. Allconnect, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Herring
Represented By: Adian Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allconnect, Inc.
Represented By: Owen Tai Hill
Represented By: Philip L. Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?