Jones et al v. Brooks Crossing Atlanta Apartments LP et al
Plaintiff: Diana Wright, Rhodena S. Kennedy, Latonya Williams-Simmons, Robert Clemons, Sr., Valerie Riley, Tramell Pree, Sr., Valecia Jones, Marcus Washington, Tia Pree, Anthony E. Gulley, Stacy Collins, Stacey Colin, Samantha Herndon, Elix Skipper, Brandon Mims, Danyotta Thomas, Megail Richardson, Earnestine Johnson, Samantha Walker, Sparkle Maupin, Jamil Colin, Latreasa E. Banks, Kenyatta Harris-Brooks and Christina Y. Bush
Defendant: Brooks Crossing GP, Inc, Brooks Crossing Atlanta Apartments LP, Pam Bussey and Ventron Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02960
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 25 NOTIFICATION OF FILING ACCEPTANCE from Clayton County State Court re #24 Electronic Remand. (bnp)
August 20, 2020 Filing 24 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Clayton County State Court re #23 Remand Order. (Attachments: #1 Filing Receipt (Status: Submitting)) (bnp)
August 20, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (bnp)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to REMAND this matter back to the State Court of Clayton County and CLOSE THE CASE. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/20/2020. (bnp)
August 20, 2020 Filing 22 Fifth AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Sparkle Maupin(for minors, as mother, next of kin HB and KH), Earnestine Johnson, Latonya Williams-Simmons(for minors, as mother, next of kin, JS, AS, AW, JW, SW, DW and JW), Rhodena S. Kennedy, Latonya Williams-Simmons, Stacey Colin(for minors, as parent, next of kin, JC, NC, EC and MC), Valecia Jones, Diana Wright, Brandon Mims, Samantha Herndon, Megail Richardson, Tramell Pree, Sr, Sparkle Maupin, Marcus Washington, Christina Y. Bush, Megail Richardson(for minors, as parent, next of kin RC, JC JR., and RC), Robert Clemons, Sr(for minors, as parent, next of kin, RC, RC JR., and RC), Tramell Pree, Sr(for minors, as parents, next of kin, TP, TP JR. and TP), Anthony E. Gulley, Earnestine Johnson(for minors, as grandmother, next of kin, JM and MP), Samantha Herndon(for minor, as mother, next of kin, DS), Tia Pree(for minors, as parent, next of kin, TP, TP JR. and TP), Samantha Walker, Stacy Collins, Danyotta Thomas(for minors, as mother, next of kin, TT, TT JR., BT and KT), Latreasa E. Banks, Samantha Walker(for minors, as mother, next of kin, AW), Stacey Colin, Tia Pree, Elix Skipper, Valerie Riley, Danyotta Thomas(for minor, as sister, next of kin, RT), Diana Wright(for minor, as mother, next of kin, DH), Robert Clemons, Sr, Jamil Colin, Danyotta Thomas, Kenyatta Harris-Brooks.(Wyatt, Anna) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court. If Plaintiffs intend to pursue their Motion to Remand and proceed solely with state law claims in State Court, the Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint NO LATER THAN 12:00 PM, AUGUST 26, 2020 that omits all factual allegations originally pled to support the dismissed Counts XV and XVI. Upon the filing of said amendment, the Court will enter an Order summarily remanding the case to the State Court of Clayton County. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/19/2020. (bnp)
August 18, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE re #15 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendants Response To Plaintiffs Motion To Remand To Clayton County State Court Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1447 filed by Brooks Crossing Atlanta Apartments LP, Brooks Crossing GP, Inc, Pam Bussey, Ventron Management, LLC. (Jorgensen, Justin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Brooks Crossing Atlanta Apartments LP, Brooks Crossing GP, Inc.(Jorgensen, Justin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Ventron Management, LLC.(Jorgensen, Justin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Pam Bussey to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Pam Bussey.(Jorgensen, Justin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 18, 2020 Submission of #16 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Brooks Crossing Atlanta Apartments LP, Brooks Crossing GP, Inc, Pam Bussey, Ventron Management, LLC. (Timmons, Drew)
August 10, 2020 Submission of #4 MOTION to Add Party, #7 MOTION to Dismiss Count XV of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Strike to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 First MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Valecia Jones. (Attachments: #1 Brief Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Wyatt, Anna)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 Fourth AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs.(Wyatt, Anna) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 8/6/2020 to add filers(bnp).
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 3, 2020 Submission of #3 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the alternative, MOTION to Compel Appearance to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by Brooks Crossing Atlanta Apartments LP, Brooks Crossing GP, Inc.(Timmons, Drew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by Pam Bussey.(Timmons, Drew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by Ventron Management, LLC. Discovery ends on 12/21/2020.(Timmons, Drew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by Brooks Crossing Atlanta Apartments LP, Brooks Crossing GP, Inc, Pam Bussey, Ventron Management, LLC. (Timmons, Drew)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Add Party Defendant Ronald Eisenberg in his Official and Individual Capacity filed by Brooks Crossing Atlanta Apartments LP, Brooks Crossing GP, Inc, Pam Bussey, Ventron Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Deposition of Valecia Jones, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Deposition of Ronald Eisenberg, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from Deposition of Ronald Eisenberg)(Timmons, Drew)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Count XV of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion to Strike with Brief In Support by Brooks Crossing Atlanta Apartments LP, Brooks Crossing GP, Inc, Pam Bussey, Ventron Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Count XV of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint)(Timmons, Drew) . Added MOTION to Strike on 7/23/2020 (tmf).
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel in Cases Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 07/20/2020. (rvb)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Add Party, Defendant Ronald Eisenberg with Brief In Support by Latreasa E. Banks, Christina Y. Bush, Robert Clemons, Sr., Robert Clemons, Sr., Jamil Colin, Stacey Colin, Stacey Colin, Stacy Collins, Anthony E. Gulley, Kenyatta Harris-Brooks, Samantha Herndon, Samantha Herndon, Earnestine Johnson, Earnestine Johnson, Valecia Jones, Rhodena S. Kennedy, Sparkle Maupin, Sparkle Maupin, Brandon Mims, Tia Pree, Tia Pree, Tramell Pree, Sr., Tramell Pree, Sr., Megail Richardson, Megail Richardson, Valerie Riley, Elix Skipper, Danyotta Thomas, Danyotta Thomas, Danyotta Thomas, Samantha Walker, Samantha Walker, Marcus Washington, Latonya Williams-Simmons, Latonya Williams-Simmons, Diana Wright and Diana Wright. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 DEFENDANTS MOTION to Dismiss, or in the alternative, MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Kandy Parker's Appearance at Deposition with Brief In Support by Brooks Crossing Atlanta Apartments LP, Brooks Crossing GP, Inc, Pam Bussey and Ventron Management, LLC. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brooks Crossing Atlanta Apartments LP, Brooks Crossing GP, Inc, Pam Bussey and Ventron Management, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Sparkle Maupin(for minors, as mother, next of kin HB and KH), Earnestine Johnson, Latonya Williams-Simmons(for minors, as mother, next of kin, JS, AS, AW, JW, SW, DW and JW), Rhodena S. Kennedy, Latonya Williams-Simmons, Stacey Colin(for minors, as parent, next of kin, JC, NC, EC and MC), Valecia Jones, Diana Wright, Brandon Mims, Samantha Herndon, Megail Richardson, Tramell Pree, Sr., Sparkle Maupin, Marcus Washington, Christina Y. Bush, Megail Richardson(for minors, as parent, next of kin RC, JC JR., and RC), Robert Clemons, Sr.(for minors, as parent, next of kin, RC, RC JR., and RC), Tramell Pree, Sr.(for minors, as parents, next of kin, TP, TP JR. and TP), Anthony E. Gulley, Earnestine Johnson(for minors, as grandmother, next of kin, JM and MP), Samantha Herndon(for minor, as mother, next of kin, DS), Tia Pree(for minors, as parent, next of kin, TP, TP JR. and TP), Samantha Walker, Stacy Collins, Danyotta Thomas(for minors, as mother, next of kin, TT, TT JR., BT and KT), Latreasa E. Banks, Samantha Walker(for minors, as mother, next of kin, AW), Stacey Colin, Tia Pree, Elix Skipper, Valerie Riley, Danyotta Thomas(for minor, as sister, next of kin, RT), Diana Wright(for minor, as mother, next of kin, DH), Robert Clemons, Sr., Jamil Colin, Danyotta Thomas and Kenyatta Harris-Brooks. (eop) (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 7/17/2020 (eop).
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Ventron Management, LLC, Brooks Crossing GP, Inc, Brooks Crossing Atlanta Apartments LP and Pam Bussey. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9921306) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit -B- Part 1 -Lower Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit -B -Part 2 -Lower Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit -B -Part 3 -Lower Court Pleadings, #5 Exhibit -B -Part -4 -Lower Court Pleadings, #6 Exhibit -C -Notice of Filing, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Brooks Crossing Atlanta Apartments LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Wright
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhodena S. Kennedy
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonya Williams-Simmons
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Clemons, Sr.
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Riley
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tramell Pree, Sr.
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valecia Jones
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Washington
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tia Pree
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony E. Gulley
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Collins
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Colin
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Herndon
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elix Skipper
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Mims
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danyotta Thomas
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megail Richardson
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnestine Johnson
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Walker
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sparkle Maupin
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamil Colin
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latreasa E. Banks
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenyatta Harris-Brooks
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Y. Bush
Represented By: Eldridge Suggs, IV
Represented By: Anna Haley Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks Crossing GP, Inc
Represented By: Justin Erik Jorgensen
Represented By: Drew Cameron Timmons
Represented By: Yamisi James
Represented By: C. Bradford Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks Crossing Atlanta Apartments LP
Represented By: Justin Erik Jorgensen
Represented By: Drew Cameron Timmons
Represented By: Yamisi James
Represented By: C. Bradford Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Bussey
Represented By: Justin Erik Jorgensen
Represented By: Drew Cameron Timmons
Represented By: Yamisi James
Represented By: C. Bradford Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventron Management, LLC
Represented By: Justin Erik Jorgensen
Represented By: Drew Cameron Timmons
Represented By: Yamisi James
Represented By: C. Bradford Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?