DataWidget, LLC v. The Rocket Science Group, LLC
Plaintiff: DataWidget, LLC
Defendant: The Rocket Science Group, LLC doing business as MailChimp
Case Number: 1:2020cv02961
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (mmc) (ADI)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (ddm) (ADI)
January 8, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Marla R. Butler on behalf of The Rocket Science Group, LLC (Butler, Marla)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (aaq) (ADI)
October 28, 2020 Submission of #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and LACK OF STANDING to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
October 27, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and LACK OF STANDING filed by The Rocket Science Group, LLC. (Nussbaum, Jonathan) Modified on 10/28/2020 to edit text (jed).
October 13, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and LACK OF STANDING Plaintiff DataWidget's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by DataWidget, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wallace, Max) Modified on 10/14/2020 to edit text (jed).
September 29, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and LACK OF STANDING with Brief In Support by The Rocket Science Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1)(Nussbaum, Jonathan)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (adg) (ADI)
September 2, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DataWidget, LLC. The Rocket Science Group, LLC waiver mailed on 7/31/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Wallace, Max)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Andrew S. Tugan Pro Hac Vice for DataWidget, LLC. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 7/31/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Gregory Scaglione Pro Hac Vice for DataWidget, LLC. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 7/31/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
July 31, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to DataWidget, LLC re #15 Order on Application for Admission PHV to Andrew S. Tugan and #14 Order on Application for Admission PHV to Gregory Scaglione. (bdb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew S. Tugan Pro Hac Vice.by DataWidget, LLC. (Wallace, Max) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 30, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew S. Tugan Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Andrew S. Tugan added appearing on behalf of DataWidget, LLC (cdg)
July 29, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory Scaglione Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9958833).. Attorney Gregory C. Scaglione added appearing on behalf of DataWidget, LLC (cdg)
July 29, 2020 RETURN of #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Andy Tugan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9958804). to attorney for correction re: Petitioners Name. (cdg)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory Scaglione Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9958833).by DataWidget, LLC. (Wallace, Max) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Andy Tugan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9958804).by DataWidget, LLC. (Wallace, Max) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Gregory C. Scaglione. Clerk to follow-up by 8/6/2020. (cdg)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Andrew S. Tugan. Clerk to follow-up by 8/6/2020. (cdg)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Rocket Science Group, LLC. (rjs)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (rjs)
July 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office re #7 A.O. Form 120. (rjs)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by DataWidget, LLC (Wallace, Max)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DataWidget, LLC by DataWidget, LLC.(Wallace, Max)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Wallace, Max)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on July 20, 2020. (ash)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by DataWidget, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9921375) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1, #2 Exhibit -2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 16, 2020 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DataWidget, LLC v. The Rocket Science Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rocket Science Group, LLC doing business as MailChimp
Represented By: Marla R. Butler
Represented By: Jonathan Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DataWidget, LLC
Represented By: Gregory C. Scaglione
Represented By: Daniel J. Huff
Represented By: Max Mathew Wallace, II
Represented By: Andrew S. Tugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?