Fraser-Gray v. International Medical Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: William Fraser-Gray
Defendant: International Medical Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02962
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER denying #8 Motion for Leave to File Surresponse. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/27/2020. (pdw)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Surresponse by William Fraser-Gray. (Attachments: #1 Brief Plaintiff's Surresponse in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue, or in the Alternative to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)(Krugler, David)
August 21, 2020 Submission of #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana or in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY BRIEF re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana or in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by International Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Anderson v. Richardson)(Knapp, Halsey)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana or in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by William Fraser-Gray. (Krugler, David) Modified on 8/7/2020 (rjs).
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Benjamin Price. Clerk to follow-up by 8/7/2020. (cdg)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana or in the Alternative to MOTION Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by International Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Amanda Winkle, #3 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #4 Exhibit 2 - Application)(Knapp, Halsey) . AddedMOTION to Dismiss on 8/7/2020 (rjs).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by International Medical Group, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9921383) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fraser-Gray v. International Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Fraser-Gray
Represented By: David Najeeb Krugler
Represented By: Benjamin Whitaker Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Barclay Hendrix
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?