Electrotek Corporation v. Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Electrotek Corporation
Defendant: Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02972
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #11 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Upon review of the information contained in the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan form completed and filed by the parties, the Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified: Discovery to be completed by January 29, 2021; dispositive motions to be submitted by March 1, 2021; consolidated pretrial order to be submitted 30 days after the Court rules on any dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/10/2020. (tmf)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Electrotek Corporation. (Saul, Joseph)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 Verified ANSWER to #8 Counterclaim by Electrotek Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Saul, Joseph) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 Verified ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses ( Discovery ends on 1/7/2021.), COUNTERCLAIM against Electrotek Corporation with Jury Demand by Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc..(Sugarman, F.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electrotek Corporation by Electrotek Corporation.(Saul, Joseph)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Electrotek Corporation. Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc. served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Saul, Joseph)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/17/2020. (tmf)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.. (eop)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Electrotek Corporation. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9922252) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Supply Agreement, #2 Exhibit -2 -Acuity Invoices, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electrotek Corporation v. Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrotek Corporation
Represented By: Jason S. Alloy
Represented By: Joseph Harris Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acuity Brands Lighting, Inc.
Represented By: F. Skip Sugarman
Represented By: Matthew G. Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?