Kinder et al v. Koch Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Scott and David Kinder
Defendant: Koch Industries, Inc., Koch Benefits Administrative Committee, Koch Business Solutions, LP and John Does 1-30
Case Number: 1:2020cv02973
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 28, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE Of Filing Joint Statement Regarding Class Communications by John Does 1-30, Koch Benefits Administrative Committee, Koch Business Solutions, LP, Koch Industries, Inc. (Heron, John)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, Koch Benefits Administrative Committee Answer due 9/17/2020; Koch Business Solutions, LP Answer due 9/17/2020; Koch Industries, Inc. Answer due 9/17/2020; granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Move for Class Certification and will be determined at the Rule 26(f) conference. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/17/2020. (dob)
August 14, 2020 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer; Motion for Extension of Time to Move for Class Certification by John Does 1-30, Koch Benefits Administrative Committee, Koch Business Solutions, LP, Koch Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heron, John) . Added MOTION for Extension of Time on 8/17/2020 (dob).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kathryn Kimball Mizelle by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on August 14, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
August 14, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Kathryn Kimball Mizelle Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10020625).. Attorney Kathryn Kimball Mizelle added appearing on behalf of John Does 1-30, Koch Benefits Administrative Committee, Koch Business Solutions, LP, Koch Industries, Inc. (nmb)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Evan Miller; and granting #22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Miguel F. Eaton by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on August 14, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
August 14, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #22 APPLICATION for Admission of Miguel F. Eaton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10020572).. Attorney Miguel Eaton added appearing on behalf of John Does 1-30, Koch Benefits Administrative Committee, Koch Business Solutions, LP, Koch Industries, Inc. (nmb)
August 14, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Evan Miller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10020494).. Attorney Evan Miller added appearing on behalf of John Does 1-30, Koch Benefits Administrative Committee, Koch Business Solutions, LP, Koch Industries, Inc. (nmb)
August 12, 2020 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of Kathryn Kimball Mizelle Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10020625).by John Does 1-30, Koch Benefits Administrative Committee, Koch Business Solutions, LP, Koch Industries, Inc.. (Heron, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 12, 2020 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of Miguel F. Eaton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10020572).by John Does 1-30, Koch Benefits Administrative Committee, Koch Business Solutions, LP, Koch Industries, Inc.. (Heron, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 12, 2020 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Evan Miller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10020494).by John Does 1-30, Koch Benefits Administrative Committee, Koch Business Solutions, LP, Koch Industries, Inc.. (Heron, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 11, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Marie Nocharli on behalf of John Does 1-30, Koch Benefits Administrative Committee, Koch Business Solutions, LP, Koch Industries, Inc. (Nocharli, Rebecca)
August 11, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John Heron, IV on behalf of John Does 1-30, Koch Benefits Administrative Committee, Koch Business Solutions, LP, Koch Industries, Inc. (Heron, John)
August 10, 2020 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed by David Kinder, Tracy Scott. Koch Benefits Administrative Committee served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (Richter, Kai)
August 10, 2020 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by David Kinder, Tracy Scott. Koch Business Solutions, LP served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (Richter, Kai)
August 10, 2020 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by David Kinder, Tracy Scott. Koch Industries, Inc. served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (Richter, Kai)
August 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Josh Sanford by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on August 9, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
August 7, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Josh Sanford Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9995472).. Attorney Josh Sanford added appearing on behalf of David Kinder (cdg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Josh Sanford Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9995472).by David Kinder, Tracy Scott. (Sparks, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Josh Sanford. Clerk to follow-up by 8/10/2020. (cdg)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kai H. Richter; and granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul J. Lukas by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on July 27, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
July 27, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul J. Lukas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9940055).. Attorney Paul J. Lukas added appearing on behalf of David Kinder, Tracy Scott (nmb)
July 27, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Kai H. Richter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9940042).. Attorney Kai H. Richter added appearing on behalf of David Kinder, Tracy Scott (nmb)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brock J. Specht; and granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Grace Irene Chanin by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on July 27, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
July 27, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Grace Irene Chanin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9940017).. Attorney Grace Irene Chanin added appearing on behalf of David Kinder, Tracy Scott (nmb)
July 27, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Brock J. Specht Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9939940).. Attorney Brock J. Specht added appearing on behalf of David Kinder, Tracy Scott (nmb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul J. Lukas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9940055).by David Kinder, Tracy Scott. (Sparks, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. Modified on 7/22/2020 to correct name of PHV applicant per call from attorney (bnp).
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Kai H. Richter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9940042).by David Kinder, Tracy Scott. (Sparks, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. Modified on 7/22/2020 to correct name of PHV applicant per call from attorney (bnp).
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Grace Irene Chanin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9940017).by David Kinder, Tracy Scott. (Sparks, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. Modified on 7/22/2020 to correct name of PHV applicant per call from attorney (bnp).
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Brock J. Specht Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9939940).by David Kinder, Tracy Scott. (Sparks, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/17/2020. (dob)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Koch Benefits Administrative Committee. (eop)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Koch Business Solutions, LP. (eop)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Koch Industries, Inc.. (eop)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by David Kinder and Tracy Scott. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9921744) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinder et al v. Koch Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Marie Nocharli
Represented By: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Represented By: Miguel Eaton
Represented By: John Heron, IV
Represented By: Evan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Benefits Administrative Committee
Represented By: Rebecca Marie Nocharli
Represented By: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Represented By: Miguel Eaton
Represented By: John Heron, IV
Represented By: Evan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Business Solutions, LP
Represented By: Rebecca Marie Nocharli
Represented By: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Represented By: Miguel Eaton
Represented By: John Heron, IV
Represented By: Evan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-30
Represented By: Rebecca Marie Nocharli
Represented By: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Represented By: Miguel Eaton
Represented By: John Heron, IV
Represented By: Evan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Scott
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks, Sr
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Paul J. Lukas
Represented By: Grace Irene Chanin
Represented By: Kai H. Richter
Represented By: Brock J. Specht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kinder
Represented By: John Thomas Sparks, Sr
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Paul J. Lukas
Represented By: Grace Irene Chanin
Represented By: Kai H. Richter
Represented By: Brock J. Specht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?