Floyd v. Manuel et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Floyd
Defendant: Bruce Wright, Tiffiny Manuel, Keith Melton, Patsy Roberts, Jacob Rhein and Eric Whitlow
Case Number: 1:2020cv02974
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 USCA Acknowledgment of #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Curtis Floyd. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 20-13066-J. (kac)
August 17, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Curtis Floyd re #12 Order. (jpk)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #9 Application to Appeal in forma pauperis. The Court CERTIFIES that Plaintiff's Appeal is NOT TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH; and DENIES Plaintiff's #9 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Further requests to proceed in forma pauperis should be directed by motion to the circuit court within 30 days pursuant to Fed.R.App.P.24. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/17/2020. (jpk)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Clerk's Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #8 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re: #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Curtis Floyd. (kac)
August 12, 2020 Submission of #9 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (kac)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis by Curtis Floyd. (kac)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Clerk's Judgment, #6 Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous by Curtis Floyd. (Attachments: #1 Appeal Receipt Sheet)(kac)
July 22, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (jpk)
July 22, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Curtis Floyd re #7 Clerk's Judgment and #6 Order. (jpk)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing this action (jpk)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE AS FRIVOLOUS pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B). The Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's #3 Complaint and DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/21/2020. (jpk)
July 20, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Curtis Floyd as to Curtis Floyd regarding #5 Order. (mlb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
July 20, 2020 Submission of #4 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpk)
July 20, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Curtis Floyd re #4 Order. (jpk)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to submit this action to the District Judge for review of Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 7/20/2020. (jpk)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Curtis Floyd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 17, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Curtis Floyd re #2 Order. (jpk)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Fifth Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020. (jpk)
July 17, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (jpk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Curtis Floyd. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floyd v. Manuel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffiny Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patsy Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Rhein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Whitlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?