Cargle v. Henry County Superior Court et al
Petitioner: Steven Lee Cargle
Respondent: Henry County Superior Court, Henry County Adult Detention Ctr. and State of Georgia
Case Number: 1:2020cv02981
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Steven Lee Cargle re: #9 Notice (Other). (kac)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Steven Lee Cargle re #10 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Steven Lee Cargle, #11 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,. (dob)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Service of #10 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 9/3/2020. (dob)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Steven Lee Cargle be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 9/3/2020. (dob)
September 3, 2020 Submission of #3 Order, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (dob)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits by Steven Lee Cargle (jpa)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Steven Lee Cargle. (jpa)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing Letter re status by Steven Lee Cargle (jpa)
August 5, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Steven Lee Cargle re #5 Order. (aaq)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Correspondence re Ineffective Counsel and Pleadings filed in the Superior Court of Henry County, and Request to be fully and immediately discharge and acquitted by Steven Lee Cargle. (tcc)
July 29, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Steven Lee Cargle re #3 Order, Form Sent. (bjh)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner must, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, either submit the full initial filing fee of $5.00, or execute and return a financial affidavit seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis... The Clerk is DIRECTED to forward the appropriate financial affidavit to Petitioner together with a copy of this Order. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned Magistrate Judge upon the expiration of the aforementioned time period. (form sent) Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 7/29/20. (bjh)
July 20, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Steven Lee Cargle re #2 Order. (jpk)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Fifth Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020. (jpk)
July 20, 2020 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand for IFP review. (jpk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Steven Lee Cargle. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cargle v. Henry County Superior Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Lee Cargle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Henry County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Henry County Adult Detention Ctr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?